CA SB876 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on September 27 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-09-27 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 687, Statutes of 2014.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on September 27 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-09-27 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 687, Statutes of 2014.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Sections 8278.3, 8357, 8447, 8450, 48000, 51749.5, 53012, 84754.6, 89295, 92495, and 92675 of the Education Code, and to amend Section 10502 of the Public Contract Code, relating to education finance, and making an appropriation therefor, to take effect immediately, bill related to the budget.
Title
Education finance.
Sponsors
No sponsor information available at this time. |
Roll Calls
2014-08-29 - Senate - Unfinished Supp 3 SB876 Committee on B. & F.R. (Leno) Concurrence (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-08-29 - Assembly - SB 876 B.& F. R. Senate Third Reading By SKINNER (Y: 73 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2014-08-14 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 23 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2014-04-10 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB876 Committee on B. & F.R. (Leno) (Y: 22 N: 12 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-08-29 - Assembly - SB 876 B.& F. R. Senate Third Reading By SKINNER (Y: 73 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2014-08-14 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 23 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2014-04-10 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB876 Committee on B. & F.R. (Leno) (Y: 22 N: 12 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-09-27 | Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 687, Statutes of 2014. | |
2014-09-27 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2014-09-08 | Senate | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3 p.m. |
2014-08-29 | Senate | In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending. Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 35. Noes 0. Page 4986.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling. |
2014-08-29 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 73. Noes 3. Page 6710.) Ordered to the Senate. |
2014-08-18 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2014-08-14 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 23. Noes 1.) (August 14). |
2014-08-13 | Assembly | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on BUDGET. |
2014-08-12 | Assembly | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on BUDGET. |
2014-08-11 | Assembly | Joint Rule 62(a) file notice suspended. (Page 5975.) |
2014-05-08 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on BUDGET. |
2014-04-10 | Assembly | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. |
2014-04-10 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 22. Noes 12. Page 3137.) Ordered to the Assembly. |
2014-04-07 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2014-04-03 | Senate | Withdrawn from committee. Ordered to second reading. |
2014-01-23 | Senate | Referred to Com. on B. & F.R. |
2014-01-10 | Senate | From printer. May be acted upon on or after February 9. |
2014-01-09 | Senate | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Education Code | 48000 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Education Code | 51749.5 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Education Code | 53012 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Education Code | 8278.3 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Education Code | 8357 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Education Code | 8447 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Education Code | 8450 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Education Code | 84754.6 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Education Code | 89295 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Education Code | 92495 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Education Code | 92675 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Public Contract Code | 10502 | Amended Code | Citation Text |