CA SB871 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Introduced on January 24 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-02-24 - Referral to Com. on JUD. rescinded because of the limitations placed on committee hearings due to ongoing health and safety risks of the COVID-19 virus.
Pending: Senate Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 24 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-02-24 - Referral to Com. on JUD. rescinded because of the limitations placed on committee hearings due to ongoing health and safety risks of the COVID-19 virus.
Pending: Senate Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Sections 120325 and 120335 of, and to repeal Section 120338 of, the Health and Safety Code, relating to public health.
Title
Public health: immunizations.
Sponsors
Sen. Richard Pan [D] | Asm. Cecilia Aguiar-Curry [D] | Asm. Akilah Weber [D] | Sen. Josh Newman [D] |
Asm. Buffy Wicks [D] | Sen. Scott Wiener [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-02-24 | Senate | Referral to Com. on JUD. rescinded because of the limitations placed on committee hearings due to ongoing health and safety risks of the COVID-19 virus. |
2022-02-23 | Senate | Referred to Coms. on HEALTH, ED., and JUD. |
2022-02-07 | Senate | Joint Rule 55 suspended. (Ayes 31. Noes 6. Page 2880.) |
2022-02-07 | Senate | (Ayes 31. Noes 6.) |
2022-02-07 | Senate | Art. IV. Sec. 8(a) of the Constitution dispensed with. |
2022-01-25 | Senate | From printer. May be acted upon on or after February 24. |
2022-01-24 | Senate | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Health and Safety Code | 120325 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Health and Safety Code | 120335 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Health and Safety Code | 120338 | Repealed Code | Citation Text |
California State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://leginfo.legislature.ca.gov/faces/billStatusClient.xhtml?bill_id=202120220SB871 |
Text | https://leginfo.legislature.ca.gov/faces/billTextClient.xhtml?bill_id=202120220SB871#99INT |