CA SB870 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Vetoed on September 19 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-09-19 - In Senate. Consideration of Governor's veto pending.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Status: Vetoed on September 19 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-09-19 - In Senate. Consideration of Governor's veto pending.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Section 4512 of the Welfare and Institutions Code, relating to developmental services.
Title
Developmental services.
Sponsors
Sen. Anthony Portantino [D] | Sen. Scott Wilk [R] | Sen. Patricia Bates [R] | Sen. Josh Becker [D] |
Asm. Cristina Garcia [D] | Sen. Jim Nielsen [R] |
Roll Calls
2022-08-31 - Assembly - SB 870 Portantino Senate Third Reading By Cristina Garcia (Y: 79 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-08-31 - Senate - Unfinished Business SB870 Portantino et al. Concurrence (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-08-11 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-06-28 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-05-25 - Senate - Special Consent SB870 (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-05-19 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-04-18 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-29 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-08-31 - Senate - Unfinished Business SB870 Portantino et al. Concurrence (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-08-11 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-06-28 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-05-25 - Senate - Special Consent SB870 (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-05-19 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-04-18 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-29 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-09-19 | Senate | In Senate. Consideration of Governor's veto pending. |
2022-09-19 | Senate | Vetoed by the Governor. |
2022-09-09 | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3 p.m. | |
2022-08-31 | Senate | Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 39. Noes 0. Page 5392.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling. |
2022-08-31 | Senate | In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending. |
2022-08-31 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. |
2022-08-22 | Assembly | Ordered to third reading. |
2022-08-22 | Assembly | Read third time and amended. |
2022-08-15 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2022-08-11 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 16. Noes 0.) (August 11). |
2022-08-03 | Assembly | August 3 set for first hearing. Placed on suspense file. |
2022-06-29 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To consent calendar. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (June 28). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2022-06-02 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on HUM. S. |
2022-05-26 | Assembly | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. |
2022-05-25 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 39. Noes 0. Page 3929.) Ordered to the Assembly. |
2022-05-23 | Senate | Ordered to special consent calendar. |
2022-05-19 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2022-05-19 | Senate | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 3772.) (May 19). |
2022-05-13 | Senate | Set for hearing May 19. |
2022-04-18 | Senate | April 18 hearing: Placed on APPR suspense file. |
2022-04-05 | Senate | Set for hearing April 18. |
2022-03-30 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 4. Noes 0. Page 3253.) (March 29). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2022-02-25 | Senate | Set for hearing March 29. |
2022-02-07 | Senate | Joint Rule 55 suspended. (Ayes 31. Noes 6. Page 2880.) |
2022-02-07 | Senate | (Ayes 31. Noes 6.) |
2022-02-07 | Senate | Art. IV. Sec. 8(a) of the Constitution dispensed with. |
2022-02-02 | Senate | Referred to Com. on HUMAN S. |
2022-01-25 | Senate | From printer. May be acted upon on or after February 24. |
2022-01-24 | Senate | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Welfare and Institutions Code | 4512 | Amended Code | Citation Text |