CA SB870 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (? 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 3 2018 - 50% progression
Action: 2018-06-14 - Assembly Rule 63 suspended. (Ayes 55. Noes 23. Page 5803.)
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

An act to amend Section 8690.6 of the Government Code, and to amend Sections 41017, 41031, 41032, 41040, 41051, 41053, 41055, 41056, 41075, 41100, 41129, 41130, 41135, 41136, 41137, 41140, 41150, 42004, and 42010 of, to amend the heading of Article 2 (commencing with Section 41030) of Chapter 2 of Part 20 of Division 2 of, to amend and repeal Section 41025 of, to amend, repeal, and add Sections 41007, 41009, 41016.5, and 41020 of, to add Sections 41007.1, 41007.2, 41007.3, 41007.4, 41007.5, and 41028 to, to repeal Section 41033 of, and to repeal and add Sections 41004 and 41030 of, the Revenue and Taxation Code, relating to state emergencies, and making an appropriation therefor, to take effect immediately, bill related to the budget.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Disaster Response Emergency Operations Account: allocation of funds: notification: Emergency Telephone Users Surcharge Act.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-05-03 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB870 B. & F.R (Y: 24 N: 11 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-06-14AssemblyAssembly Rule 63 suspended. (Ayes 55. Noes 23. Page 5803.)
2018-06-14AssemblyOrdered to third reading.
2018-06-14AssemblyWithdrawn from committee.
2018-06-14AssemblyAssembly Rule 96 suspended. (Ayes 55. Noes 23. Page 5803.)
2018-06-11AssemblyFrom committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on BUDGET.
2018-05-07AssemblyReferred to Com. on BUDGET.
2018-05-03AssemblyIn Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
2018-05-03SenateRead third time. Passed. (Ayes 24. Noes 11. Page 4928.) Ordered to the Assembly.
2018-05-01SenateRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2018-04-30SenateOrdered to second reading.
2018-04-30SenateWithdrawn from committee. (Ayes 25. Noes 11. Page 4865.)
2018-01-16SenateReferred to Com. on B. & F.R.
2018-01-11SenateFrom printer. May be acted upon on or after February 10.
2018-01-10SenateIntroduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.

Code Citations

ChapterSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Government Code8690.6Amended CodeCitation Text
Revenue and Taxation Code41007New CodeSee Bill Text
Revenue and Taxation Code41009New CodeSee Bill Text
Revenue and Taxation Code41016.5New CodeSee Bill Text
Revenue and Taxation Code41017Amended CodeCitation Text
Revenue and Taxation Code41020New CodeSee Bill Text
Revenue and Taxation Code41025Repealed CodeCitation Text
Revenue and Taxation Code41031Amended CodeCitation Text
Revenue and Taxation Code41032Amended CodeCitation Text
Revenue and Taxation Code41040Amended CodeCitation Text
Revenue and Taxation Code41051Amended CodeCitation Text
Revenue and Taxation Code41053Amended CodeCitation Text
Revenue and Taxation Code41055Amended CodeCitation Text
Revenue and Taxation Code41056Amended CodeCitation Text
Revenue and Taxation Code41075Amended CodeCitation Text
Revenue and Taxation Code41100Amended CodeCitation Text
Revenue and Taxation Code41129Amended CodeCitation Text
Revenue and Taxation Code41130Amended CodeCitation Text
Revenue and Taxation Code41135Amended CodeCitation Text
Revenue and Taxation Code41136Amended CodeCitation Text
Revenue and Taxation Code41137Amended CodeCitation Text
Revenue and Taxation Code41140Amended CodeCitation Text
Revenue and Taxation Code41150Amended CodeCitation Text
Revenue and Taxation Code42004Amended CodeCitation Text
Revenue and Taxation Code42010Amended CodeCitation Text

California State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback