CA SB87 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (? 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 27 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-27 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 32, Statutes of 2019.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

An act to amend Sections 8879.52, 14460, 14461, 16321, and 64000 of, to add Sections 14462, 14463, and 64001 to, and to repeal Division 2 (commencing with Section 64000) of Title 6.7 of, the Government Code, to add Section 7105.1 to the Revenue and Taxation Code, and to amend Sections 5066 and 9400.4 of the Vehicle Code, relating to transportation, and making an appropriation therefor, to take effect immediately, bill related to the budget.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Transportation.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-06-17 - Assembly - SB 87 B. & F. R. Senate Third Reading By TING (Y: 59 N: 17 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-17 - Assembly - SB 87 B. & F. R. Senate Third Reading By TING Amend By FONG Set #1 Motion to Lay on the Table By CALDERON (Y: 51 N: 18 NV: 10 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-17 - Senate - Unfinished Business SB87 B. & F.R. (Mitchell) Concurrence (Y: 32 N: 6 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-11 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB87 B. & F.R (Y: 27 N: 9 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-06-27 Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 32, Statutes of 2019.
2019-06-27 Approved by the Governor.
2019-06-25SenateEnrolled and presented to the Governor at 10 a.m.
2019-06-17SenateAssembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 32. Noes 6. Page 1600.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
2019-06-17SenateIn Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending.
2019-06-17AssemblyRead third time. Passed. (Ayes 59. Noes 17. Page 2304.) Ordered to the Senate.
2019-06-17AssemblyAmendments by Assembly Member Fong tabled on motion by Assembly Member Calderon. (Ayes 51. Noes 18. Page 2304.)
2019-06-17AssemblyAssembly Rule 63 and 96 suspended. (Ayes 59. Noes 12. Page 2297.)
2019-06-17AssemblyOrdered to third reading.
2019-06-17AssemblyWithdrawn from committee.
2019-06-11AssemblyFrom committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on BUDGET.
2019-05-02AssemblyReferred to Com. on BUDGET.
2019-04-11AssemblyIn Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
2019-04-11SenateRead third time. Passed. (Ayes 27. Noes 9. Page 667.) Ordered to the Assembly.
2019-04-09SenateRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2019-04-08SenateOrdered to second reading.
2019-04-08SenateWithdrawn from committee. (Ayes 28. Noes 10. Page 582.)
2019-01-24SenateReferred to Com. on B. & F.R.
2019-01-11SenateFrom printer. May be acted upon on or after February 10.
2019-01-10SenateIntroduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.

Code Citations

ChapterSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Government Code14460Amended CodeCitation Text
Government Code14461Amended CodeCitation Text
Government Code14462New CodeSee Bill Text
Government Code14463New CodeSee Bill Text
Government Code16321Amended CodeCitation Text
Government Code64000Amended CodeCitation Text
Government Code64001New CodeSee Bill Text
Government Code8879.52Amended CodeCitation Text
Revenue and Taxation Code7105.1New CodeSee Bill Text
Vehicle Code5066Amended CodeCitation Text
Vehicle Code9400.4Amended CodeCitation Text

California State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback