CA SB869 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on June 20 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-06-20 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 39, Statutes of 2014.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

An act to amend Section 101012 of, to add Sections 17070.965 and 17078.73 to, and to add and repeal Section 17070.53 of, the Education Code, relating to school facilities, and declaring the urgency thereof, to take effect immediately.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

School facilities: construction: bond act.

Sponsors

No sponsor information available at this time.

Roll Calls

2014-06-15 - Senate - Unfinished Supp 1 SB869 Committee on B. & F.R. (Leno) Concurrence (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-06-15 - Assembly - SB 869 B.& F. R. Third Reading Urgency By SKINNER (Y: 79 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-04-10 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB869 Committee on B. & F.R. (Leno) (Y: 22 N: 12 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2014-06-20 Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 39, Statutes of 2014.
2014-06-20 Approved by the Governor.
2014-06-19SenateEnrolled and presented to the Governor at 1 p.m.
2014-06-15SenateIn Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending. Urgency clause adopted. Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 37. Noes 0. Page 3908.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
2014-06-15AssemblyAssembly Rule 96 suspended. (Page 5515.) Withdrawn from committee. Ordered to third reading. Assembly Rule 63 suspended. (Page 5515.) Read third time. Urgency clause adopted. Passed. (Ayes 79. Noes 0. Page 5525.) Ordered to the Senate.
2014-06-12AssemblyFrom committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on BUDGET.
2014-05-08AssemblyReferred to Com. on BUDGET.
2014-04-10AssemblyIn Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
2014-04-10SenateRead third time. Passed. (Ayes 22. Noes 12. Page 3135.) Ordered to the Assembly.
2014-04-07SenateRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2014-04-03SenateWithdrawn from committee. Ordered to second reading.
2014-01-23SenateReferred to Com. on B. & F.R.
2014-01-10SenateFrom printer. May be acted upon on or after February 9.
2014-01-09SenateIntroduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.

Code Citations

ChapterSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Education Code101012Amended CodeCitation Text
Education Code17070.53Repealed CodeCitation Text
Education Code17070.965New CodeSee Bill Text
Education Code17078.73New CodeSee Bill Text

California State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/cgi-bin/postquery?bill_number=sb_869&sess=1314&house=S
Texthttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/13-14/bill/sen/sb_0851-0900/sb_869_bill_20140109_introduced.html
Texthttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/13-14/bill/sen/sb_0851-0900/sb_869_bill_20140612_amended_asm_v98.html
Texthttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/13-14/bill/sen/sb_0851-0900/sb_869_bill_20140617_enrolled.html
Texthttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/13-14/bill/sen/sb_0851-0900/sb_869_bill_20140620_chaptered.html
Roll Callhttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/13-14/bill/sen/sb_0851-0900/sb_869_vote_20140410_1055AM_sen_floor.html
Roll Callhttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/13-14/bill/sen/sb_0851-0900/sb_869_vote_20140615_0500PM_asm_floor.html
Roll Callhttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/13-14/bill/sen/sb_0851-0900/sb_869_vote_20140615_0701PM_sen_floor.html

Bill Comments

feedback