CA SB869 | 2011-2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on October 2 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-10-02 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 430, Statutes of 2011.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on October 2 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-10-02 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 430, Statutes of 2011.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to add Section 9884.76 to the Business and Professions Code, relating to automotive repair dealers.
Title
Automotive repair dealers: airbags.
Sponsors
Sen. Leland Yee [D] |
Roll Calls
2011-09-08 - Senate - Unfinished Business SB869 Yee Concurrence (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-09-07 - Assembly - SB 869 Yee Senate Third Reading By HAYASHI (Y: 77 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2011-08-17 - Assembly - Do pass, to Consent Calendar (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-07-05 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-05-19 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB869 Yee (Y: 38 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-04-25 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-09-07 - Assembly - SB 869 Yee Senate Third Reading By HAYASHI (Y: 77 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2011-08-17 - Assembly - Do pass, to Consent Calendar (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-07-05 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-05-19 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB869 Yee (Y: 38 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-04-25 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-10-02 | Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 430, Statutes of 2011. | |
2011-10-02 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2011-09-14 | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3:30 p.m. | |
2011-09-08 | Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 40. Noes 0. Page 2417.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling. | |
2011-09-07 | In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending. | |
2011-09-07 | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 77. Noes 0. Page 2992.) Ordered to the Senate. | |
2011-09-01 | Read third time and amended. (Page 2770.) Ordered to third reading. | |
2011-08-25 | From consent calendar. Ordered to third reading. | |
2011-08-22 | Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar. | |
2011-08-18 | From committee: Do pass. Ordered to consent calendar. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (August 17). | |
2011-07-11 | Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | |
2011-07-07 | From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (July 5). | |
2011-06-28 | Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. | |
2011-06-20 | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on B., P. & C.P. | |
2011-06-13 | Hearing postponed by committee. | |
2011-06-09 | Re-referred to Com. on B., P. & C.P. | |
2011-06-01 | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on TRANS. | |
2011-05-27 | Referred to Com. on TRANS. | |
2011-05-19 | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. | |
2011-05-19 | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 38. Noes 1. Page 1036.) Ordered to the Assembly. | |
2011-05-11 | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. | |
2011-05-10 | From committee: Be placed on second reading file pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8. | |
2011-05-03 | Set for hearing May 9. | |
2011-04-28 | Withdrawn from committee. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | |
2011-04-27 | Withdrawn from committee. Re-referred to Com. on PUB. S. | |
2011-04-26 | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 9. Noes 0. Page 737.) (April 25). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | |
2011-04-04 | Set for hearing April 25. | |
2011-03-10 | Referred to Coms. on B., P. & E.D. and PUB. S. | |
2011-02-20 | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 22. | |
2011-02-18 | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Business and Professions Code | 9884.7 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Business and Professions Code | 9884.76 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Business and Professions Code | 9889.3 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Vehicle Code | 27317 | Amended Code | Citation Text |