CA SB869 | 2009-2010 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Engrossed on April 22 2010 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-10-07 - Read third time. Amended. (Page 7116.) To third reading.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

An act to amend Section 15432 of the Government Code, and to amend Sections 129275, 129280, 129285, and 129295 of the Health and Safety Code, relating to developmental services, declaring the urgency thereof, to take effect immediately, and making an appropriation therefor.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Loan programs for facilities for persons with

Sponsors

No sponsor information available at this time.

Roll Calls

2010-04-22 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB869 Committee on B. & F.R. (Ducheny) (Y: 24 N: 5 NV: 10 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2010-10-07 Read third time. Amended. (Page 7116.) To third reading.
2010-06-10 Placed on second reading file. Read second time. To third reading.
2010-04-22 In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
2010-04-22 Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 24. Noes 5. Page 3272.) To Assembly.
2010-04-19 Read second time. To third reading.
2010-04-15 Withdrawn from committee. Placed on second reading file.
2010-01-21 To Com. on RLS.
2010-01-12 From print. May be acted upon on or after February 11.
2010-01-11 Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.

California State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback