CA SB866 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 12 2022 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-08-31 - Ordered to inactive file on request of Assembly Member Santiago.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on May 12 2022 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-08-31 - Ordered to inactive file on request of Assembly Member Santiago.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to add Section 6931 to the Family Code, relating to minors.
Title
Minors: vaccine consent.
Sponsors
Sen. Richard Pan [D] | Sen. Scott Wiener [D] | Asm. Buffy Wicks [D] | Asm. Cecilia Aguiar-Curry [D] |
Asm. Akilah Weber [D] | Asm. Evan Low [D] | Sen. Josh Newman [D] | Asm. Philip Ting [D] |
Roll Calls
2022-06-16 - Assembly - SB 866 Wiener Senate Third Reading Amend By WICKS Set #1 (Y: 38 N: 22 NV: 0 Abs: 19) [PASS]
2022-06-01 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 6 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-05-12 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB866 Wiener et al (Y: 21 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 11) [PASS]
2022-05-05 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2022-06-01 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 6 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-05-12 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB866 Wiener et al (Y: 21 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 11) [PASS]
2022-05-05 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-08-31 | Assembly | Ordered to inactive file on request of Assembly Member Santiago. |
2022-06-16 | Assembly | Ordered to third reading. |
2022-06-16 | Assembly | Read third time and amended. (Ayes 38. Noes 22. Page 5396.) |
2022-06-02 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2022-06-01 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 6. Noes 4.) (June 1). |
2022-05-19 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on JUD. |
2022-05-12 | Assembly | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. |
2022-05-12 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 21. Noes 8. Page 3669.) Ordered to the Assembly. |
2022-05-09 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2022-05-05 | Senate | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 3627.) (May 5). |
2022-05-02 | Senate | Set for hearing May 5. |
2022-03-09 | Senate | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on JUD. |
2022-02-23 | Senate | Referred to Com. on JUD. |
2022-02-07 | Senate | Joint Rule 55 suspended. (Ayes 31. Noes 6. Page 2880.) |
2022-02-07 | Senate | (Ayes 31. Noes 6.) |
2022-02-07 | Senate | Art. IV. Sec. 8(a) of the Constitution dispensed with. |
2022-01-21 | Senate | From printer. May be acted upon on or after February 20. |
2022-01-20 | Senate | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Family Code | 6931 | New Code | See Bill Text |