CA SB858 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (? 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 3 2018 - 50% progression
Action: 2018-06-11 - From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on BUDGET.
Pending: Assembly Budget Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

An act to add Chapter 5 (commencing with Section 19400) to Division 19 of the Elections Code, to amend Section 13953 of the Government Code, to add Section 1052 to the Military and Veterans Code, and to amend Section 40610 of the Vehicle Code, relating to state government, and making an appropriation therefor, to take effect immediately, bill related to the budget.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

State government.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-05-03 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB858 B. & F.R (Y: 24 N: 11 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-06-11AssemblyFrom committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on BUDGET.
2018-05-07AssemblyReferred to Com. on BUDGET.
2018-05-03AssemblyIn Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
2018-05-03SenateRead third time. Passed. (Ayes 24. Noes 11. Page 4924.) Ordered to the Assembly.
2018-05-01SenateRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2018-04-30SenateOrdered to second reading.
2018-04-30SenateWithdrawn from committee. (Ayes 25. Noes 11. Page 4865.)
2018-01-16SenateReferred to Com. on B. & F.R.
2018-01-11SenateFrom printer. May be acted upon on or after February 10.
2018-01-10SenateIntroduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.

Code Citations

ChapterSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Elections Code19400New CodeSee Bill Text
Government Code13953Amended CodeCitation Text
Military and Veterans Code1052New CodeSee Bill Text
Vehicle Code40610Amended CodeCitation Text

California State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback