CA SB857 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Failed on November 30 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-11-30 - From Assembly without further action.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Failed on November 30 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-11-30 - From Assembly without further action.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Sections 19829.9845, 19829.9846, 22871.3, 22874.3, 22879, 22944.5, and 22958.1 of the Government Code, relating to state employment, and making an appropriation therefor, to take effect immediately, bill related to the budget.
Title
State employment: memorandum of understanding:
Sponsors
No sponsor information available at this time. |
Roll Calls
2016-08-10 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2016-04-14 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB857 Committee On B. & F.R. (Leno) (Y: 25 N: 11 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-04-14 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB857 Committee On B. & F.R. (Leno) (Y: 25 N: 11 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-11-30 | Assembly | From Assembly without further action. |
2016-11-30 | Assembly | Died on the inactive file. |
2016-08-24 | Assembly | Ordered to inactive file on request of Assembly Member Calderon. |
2016-08-11 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2016-08-10 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 25. Noes 0.) (August 10). |
2016-08-08 | Assembly | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on BUDGET. |
2016-05-25 | Assembly | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on BUDGET. |
2016-05-02 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on BUDGET. |
2016-04-14 | Assembly | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. |
2016-04-14 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 25. Noes 11. Page 3546.) Ordered to the Assembly. |
2016-04-12 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2016-04-11 | Senate | Withdrawn from committee. Ordered to second reading. |
2016-01-11 | Senate | Referred to Com. on B. & F.R. |
2016-01-08 | Senate | From printer. May be acted upon on or after February 7. |
2016-01-07 | Senate | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Government Code | 19829.9845 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Government Code | 19829.9846 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Government Code | 22871.3 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Government Code | 22874.3 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Government Code | 22879 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Government Code | 22944.5 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Government Code | 22958.1 | Amended Code | Citation Text |