CA SB856 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on September 22 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-09-22 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 469, Statutes of 2022.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on September 22 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-09-22 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 469, Statutes of 2022.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Sections 3031 and 4181 of, to amend and repeal Section 4651 of, to amend, repeal, and add Sections 3003.1, 3004.5, 3005.5, 3031.2, 3040, 3950, 3953, 4150, 4304, 4650, 4652, 4653, 4654, 4655, and 4657 of, to add Sections 4651.5 and 4652.5 to, and to add Chapter 1.5 (commencing with Section 3965) to Part 3 of Division 4 of, the Fish and Game Code, and to add Article 5 (commencing with Section 10791) to Chapter 1 of Part 3 of Division 5 of the Food and Agricultural Code, relating to wild pigs.
Title
Wild pigs: validations.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-08-23 - Senate - Unfinished Business SB856 Dodd et al. Concurrence (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2022-08-22 - Assembly - SB 856 Dodd Senate Third Reading By DAHLE (Y: 69 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 11) [PASS]
2022-08-11 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2022-06-28 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-05-26 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB856 Dodd (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2022-05-19 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 5 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-04-04 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-03-08 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-08-22 - Assembly - SB 856 Dodd Senate Third Reading By DAHLE (Y: 69 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 11) [PASS]
2022-08-11 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2022-06-28 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-05-26 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB856 Dodd (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2022-05-19 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 5 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-04-04 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-03-08 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-09-22 | Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 469, Statutes of 2022. | |
2022-09-22 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2022-08-30 | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3 p.m. | |
2022-08-23 | Senate | Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 35. Noes 0. Page 5009.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling. |
2022-08-22 | Senate | In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending. |
2022-08-22 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 69. Noes 0. Page 6039.) Ordered to the Senate. |
2022-08-17 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2022-08-16 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. Ordered to second reading. |
2022-08-15 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 12. Noes 0.) (August 11). |
2022-08-03 | Assembly | August 3 set for first hearing. Placed on suspense file. |
2022-06-29 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2022-06-28 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 13. Noes 0.) (June 28). |
2022-06-20 | Assembly | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on W.,P., & W. |
2022-06-02 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on W.,P., & W. |
2022-05-27 | Assembly | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. |
2022-05-26 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 35. Noes 0. Page 3981.) Ordered to the Assembly. |
2022-05-24 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2022-05-23 | Senate | Ordered to second reading. |
2022-05-23 | Senate | Read third time and amended. |
2022-05-23 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2022-05-19 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Ordered to second reading. |
2022-05-19 | Senate | From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 5. Noes 1. Page 3771.) (May 19). |
2022-05-13 | Senate | Set for hearing May 19. |
2022-04-04 | Senate | April 4 hearing: Placed on APPR suspense file. |
2022-03-25 | Senate | Set for hearing April 4. |
2022-03-09 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2022-03-08 | Senate | From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 3048.) (March 8). |
2022-02-11 | Senate | Set for hearing March 8. |
2022-02-07 | Senate | Joint Rule 55 suspended. (Ayes 31. Noes 6. Page 2880.) |
2022-02-07 | Senate | (Ayes 31. Noes 6.) |
2022-02-07 | Senate | Art. IV. Sec. 8(a) of the Constitution dispensed with. |
2022-01-26 | Senate | Referred to Com. on N.R. & W. |
2022-01-20 | Senate | From printer. May be acted upon on or after February 19. |
2022-01-19 | Senate | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Food and Agricultural Code | 10791 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Fish and Game Code | 3003.1 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Fish and Game Code | 3004.5 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Fish and Game Code | 3005.5 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Fish and Game Code | 3031 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Fish and Game Code | 3031.2 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Fish and Game Code | 3040 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Fish and Game Code | 3950 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Fish and Game Code | 3953 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Fish and Game Code | 4150 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Fish and Game Code | 4181 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Fish and Game Code | 4304 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Fish and Game Code | 4650 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Fish and Game Code | 4651 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Fish and Game Code | 4652 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Fish and Game Code | 4653 | Repealed Code | Citation Text |
Fish and Game Code | 4654 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Fish and Game Code | 4655 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Fish and Game Code | 4657 | New Code | See Bill Text |