CA SB855 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 13-1)
Status: Passed on September 25 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-09-25 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 151, Statutes of 2020.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 13-1)
Status: Passed on September 25 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-09-25 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 151, Statutes of 2020.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to add Sections 1367.045 and 1374.721 to, and to repeal and add Section 1374.72 of, the Health and Safety Code, and to add Section 10144.52 to, and to repeal and add Section 10144.5 of, the Insurance Code, relating to health coverage.
Title
Health coverage: mental health or substance use disorders.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-08-30 - Senate - Unfinished Business SB855 Wiener et al. Concurrence (Y: 31 N: 7 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-08-30 - Senate - Unfinished Business SB855 Wiener et al. Concurrence Reconsider (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-08-30 - Senate - Unfinished Business SB855 Wiener et al. Concurrence (Y: 30 N: 8 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-08-26 - Assembly - SB 855 Wiener Senate Third Reading By Arambula (Y: 63 N: 1 NV: 15 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-08-20 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 14 N: 1 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-08-04 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-25 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB855 Wiener et al (Y: 30 N: 5 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-18 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-09 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-05-13 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 7 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-08-30 - Senate - Unfinished Business SB855 Wiener et al. Concurrence Reconsider (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-08-30 - Senate - Unfinished Business SB855 Wiener et al. Concurrence (Y: 30 N: 8 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-08-26 - Assembly - SB 855 Wiener Senate Third Reading By Arambula (Y: 63 N: 1 NV: 15 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-08-20 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 14 N: 1 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-08-04 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-25 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB855 Wiener et al (Y: 30 N: 5 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-18 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-09 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-05-13 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 7 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-09-25 | Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 151, Statutes of 2020. | |
2020-09-25 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2020-09-09 | Senate | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3 p.m. |
2020-08-30 | Senate | Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 31. Noes 7.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling. |
2020-08-30 | Senate | Reconsideration granted. (Ayes 39. Noes 0.) |
2020-08-30 | Senate | Motion to reconsider made by Senator Wiener. |
2020-08-30 | Senate | Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 30. Noes 8.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling. |
2020-08-28 | Senate | In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending. |
2020-08-26 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 63. Noes 1. Page 5221.) Ordered to the Senate. |
2020-08-25 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2020-08-24 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. Ordered to second reading. |
2020-08-20 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 14. Noes 1.) (August 20). |
2020-08-18 | Assembly | August 18 set for first hearing. Placed on suspense file. |
2020-08-07 | Assembly | Coauthors revised. |
2020-08-06 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2020-08-05 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 13. Noes 0.) (August 4). |
2020-07-27 | Assembly | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on HEALTH. |
2020-06-29 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on HEALTH. |
2020-06-25 | Assembly | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. |
2020-06-25 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 30. Noes 5. Page 3862.) Ordered to the Assembly. |
2020-06-22 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2020-06-18 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Ordered to second reading. |
2020-06-18 | Senate | From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 5. Noes 2. Page 3766.) (June 18). |
2020-06-11 | Senate | Set for hearing June 18. |
2020-06-09 | Senate | June 9 hearing: Placed on APPR. suspense file. |
2020-06-03 | Senate | Set for hearing June 9. |
2020-06-02 | Senate | Hearing rescheduled due to Capitol closure. |
2020-05-26 | Senate | Set for hearing June 1. |
2020-05-19 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2020-05-18 | Senate | From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 2. Page 3533.) (May 13). |
2020-05-12 | Senate | Referral to Com. on JUD. rescinded due to the shortened 2020 Legislative Calendar. |
2020-05-11 | Senate | Set for hearing May 13. |
2020-05-05 | Senate | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on HEALTH. |
2020-01-22 | Senate | Referred to Coms. on HEALTH and JUD. |
2020-01-15 | Senate | From printer. May be acted upon on or after February 14. |
2020-01-14 | Senate | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Health and Safety Code | 1367.045 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Health and Safety Code | 1374.721 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Insurance Code | 10144.52 | New Code | See Bill Text |