CA SB852 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on September 28 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-09-28 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 207, Statutes of 2020.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on September 28 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-09-28 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 207, Statutes of 2020.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to add Chapter 10 (commencing with Section 127690) to Part 2 of Division 107 of, and to repeal Sections 127694 and 127695 of, the Health and Safety Code, relating to health care.
Title
Health care: prescription drugs.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-08-31 - Assembly - SB 852 Pan Senate Third Reading By Wood (Y: 66 N: 7 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-08-31 - Senate - Unfinished Business SB852 Pan et al. Concurrence (Y: 31 N: 8 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-08-20 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 13 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-08-12 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 11 N: 1 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-25 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB852 Pan (Y: 31 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-18 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 5 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-09 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-05-13 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 7 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-08-31 - Senate - Unfinished Business SB852 Pan et al. Concurrence (Y: 31 N: 8 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-08-20 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 13 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-08-12 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 11 N: 1 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-25 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB852 Pan (Y: 31 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-18 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 5 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-09 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-05-13 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 7 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-09-28 | Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 207, Statutes of 2020. | |
2020-09-28 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2020-09-08 | Senate | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 2 p.m. |
2020-08-31 | Senate | Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 31. Noes 8.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling. |
2020-08-31 | Senate | In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending. |
2020-08-31 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 66. Noes 7. Page 5415.) Ordered to the Senate. |
2020-08-25 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2020-08-24 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. Ordered to second reading. |
2020-08-20 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 13. Noes 5.) (August 20). |
2020-08-18 | Assembly | August 18 set for first hearing. Placed on suspense file. |
2020-08-13 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2020-08-12 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 11. Noes 1.) (August 12). |
2020-08-05 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on HEALTH pursuant to Assembly Rule 96. |
2020-08-03 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on RLS. pursuant to Assembly Rule 96. |
2020-08-03 | Assembly | August 4 hearing postponed by committee. |
2020-06-29 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on HEALTH. |
2020-06-25 | Assembly | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. |
2020-06-25 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 31. Noes 9. Page 3844.) Ordered to the Assembly. |
2020-06-22 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2020-06-18 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Ordered to second reading. |
2020-06-18 | Senate | From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 5. Noes 1. Page 3766.) (June 18). |
2020-06-11 | Senate | Set for hearing June 18. |
2020-06-09 | Senate | June 9 hearing: Placed on APPR. suspense file. |
2020-06-03 | Senate | Set for hearing June 9. |
2020-05-19 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2020-05-18 | Senate | From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 2. Page 3533.) (May 13). |
2020-05-11 | Senate | Re-referred to Com. on HEALTH. |
2020-05-11 | Senate | Set for hearing May 13 in HEALTH pending receipt. |
2020-03-16 | Senate | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on RLS. |
2020-01-22 | Senate | Referred to Com. on RLS. |
2020-01-14 | Senate | From printer. May be acted upon on or after February 13. |
2020-01-13 | Senate | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Health and Safety Code | 127690 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Health and Safety Code | 127694 | Repealed Code | Citation Text |
Health and Safety Code | 127695 | Repealed Code | Citation Text |