CA SB852 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on September 28 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-08-31 - Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 66. Noes 7. Page 5415.) Ordered to the Senate.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

An act to add Chapter 10 (commencing with Section 127690) to Part 2 of Division 107 of, and to repeal Sections 127694 and 127695 of, the Health and Safety Code, relating to health care.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Health care: prescription drugs.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-08-31 - Assembly - SB 852 Pan Senate Third Reading By Wood (Y: 66 N: 7 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-08-31 - Senate - Unfinished Business SB852 Pan et al. Concurrence (Y: 31 N: 8 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-08-20 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 13 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-08-12 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 11 N: 1 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-25 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB852 Pan (Y: 31 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-18 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 5 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-09 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-05-13 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 7 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-08-31 Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 66. Noes 7. Page 5415.) Ordered to the Senate.
2020-09-28 Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 207, Statutes of 2020.
2020-09-28 Approved by the Governor.
2020-09-08SenateEnrolled and presented to the Governor at 2 p.m.
2020-08-31SenateAssembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 31. Noes 8.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
2020-08-31SenateIn Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending.
2020-08-31AssemblyRead third time. Passed. (Ayes 66. Noes 7.) Ordered to the Senate.
2020-08-25AssemblyRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2020-08-24AssemblyRead second time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
2020-08-20AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 13. Noes 5.) (August 20).
2020-08-18AssemblyAugust 18 set for first hearing. Placed on suspense file.
2020-08-13AssemblyRead second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2020-08-12AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 11. Noes 1.) (August 12).
2020-08-05AssemblyRe-referred to Com. on HEALTH pursuant to Assembly Rule 96.
2020-08-03AssemblyRe-referred to Com. on RLS. pursuant to Assembly Rule 96.
2020-08-03AssemblyAugust 4 hearing postponed by committee.
2020-06-29AssemblyReferred to Com. on HEALTH.
2020-06-25AssemblyIn Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
2020-06-25SenateRead third time. Passed. (Ayes 31. Noes 9. Page 3844.) Ordered to the Assembly.
2020-06-22SenateRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2020-06-18SenateRead second time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
2020-06-18SenateFrom committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 5. Noes 1. Page 3766.) (June 18).
2020-06-11SenateSet for hearing June 18.
2020-06-09SenateJune 9 hearing: Placed on APPR. suspense file.
2020-06-03SenateSet for hearing June 9.
2020-05-19SenateRead second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2020-05-18SenateFrom committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 2. Page 3533.) (May 13).
2020-05-11SenateRe-referred to Com. on HEALTH.
2020-05-11SenateSet for hearing May 13 in HEALTH pending receipt.
2020-03-16SenateFrom committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on RLS.
2020-01-22SenateReferred to Com. on RLS.
2020-01-14SenateFrom printer. May be acted upon on or after February 13.
2020-01-13SenateIntroduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.

Code Citations

ChapterSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Health and Safety Code127690New CodeSee Bill Text
Health and Safety Code127694Repealed CodeCitation Text
Health and Safety Code127695Repealed CodeCitation Text

California State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback