CA SB850 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on February 1 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-02-01 - Returned to Secretary of Senate pursuant to Joint Rule 56.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

An act to add Chapter 16 (commencing with Section 1425) to Title 10 of Part 2 of the Penal Code, relating to courts.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Courts: notification system.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2024-01-16 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-01-09 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2024-02-01SenateReturned to Secretary of Senate pursuant to Joint Rule 56.
2024-01-18SenateJanuary 18 hearing: Held in committee and under submission.
2024-01-17SenateSet for hearing January 18.
2024-01-16SenateJanuary 16 hearing: Placed on APPR suspense file.
2024-01-10SenateSet for hearing January 16.
2024-01-09SenateFrom committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 0. Page 2959.) (January 9). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2024-01-04SenateSet for hearing January 9.
2024-01-03SenateRe-referred to Com. on PUB S.
2024-01-03SenateFrom committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on RLS.
2023-03-01SenateReferred to Com. on RLS.
2023-02-21SenateFrom printer. May be acted upon on or after March 20.
2023-02-17SenateIntroduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.

Code Citations

ChapterSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Penal Code1425New CodeSee Bill Text

California State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback