CA SB850 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on August 29 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-08-29 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 219, Statutes of 2022.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on August 29 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-08-29 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 219, Statutes of 2022.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to repeal and add Section 21541 of the Government Code, relating to public employees’ retirement.
Title
Special death benefits: additional percentages: children of members.
Sponsors
Sen. John Laird [D] |
Roll Calls
2022-08-11 - Assembly - SB 850 Laird Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 76 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2022-08-03 - Assembly - Do pass. To Consent Calendar (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-06-22 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-05-25 - Senate - Special Consent SB850 (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-05-19 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-04-04 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-03-21 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with the recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-08-03 - Assembly - Do pass. To Consent Calendar (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-06-22 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-05-25 - Senate - Special Consent SB850 (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-05-19 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-04-04 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-03-21 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with the recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-08-29 | Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 219, Statutes of 2022. | |
2022-08-29 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2022-08-17 | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 10:30 a.m. | |
2022-08-11 | Senate | In Senate. Ordered to engrossing and enrolling. |
2022-08-11 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 76. Noes 0. Page 5827.) Ordered to the Senate. |
2022-08-04 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar. |
2022-08-03 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. Ordered to consent calendar. (Ayes 15. Noes 0.) (August 3). |
2022-06-22 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To consent calendar. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (June 22). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2022-06-02 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on P.E. & R. |
2022-05-26 | Assembly | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. |
2022-05-25 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 39. Noes 0. Page 3928.) Ordered to the Assembly. |
2022-05-23 | Senate | Ordered to special consent calendar. |
2022-05-19 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2022-05-19 | Senate | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 3771.) (May 19). |
2022-05-13 | Senate | Set for hearing May 19. |
2022-04-04 | Senate | April 4 hearing: Placed on APPR suspense file. |
2022-03-25 | Senate | Set for hearing April 4. |
2022-03-22 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR with recommendation: To consent calendar. (Ayes 5. Noes 0. Page 3168.) (March 21). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2022-03-14 | Senate | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on L., P.E. & R. |
2022-03-11 | Senate | Set for hearing March 21. |
2022-02-07 | Senate | Joint Rule 55 suspended. (Ayes 31. Noes 6. Page 2880.) |
2022-02-07 | Senate | (Ayes 31. Noes 6.) |
2022-02-07 | Senate | Art. IV. Sec. 8(a) of the Constitution dispensed with. |
2022-01-26 | Senate | Referred to Com. on L., P.E. & R. |
2022-01-19 | Senate | From printer. May be acted upon on or after February 18. |
2022-01-18 | Senate | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Government Code | 21541 | New Code | See Bill Text |