CA SB85 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (? 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 27 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-27 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 31, Statutes of 2019.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

An act to amend Sections 2787, 2791, and 2796 of the Fish and Game Code, to amend Sections 224 and 49015 of the Food and Agricultural Code, to amend Sections 13108, 13146, 13146.1, 13146.2, 13146.3, 13217, 38591.2, 43019, 43019.1, and 43019.2 of, and to add Sections 13146.6, 16022.5, and 44391.4 to, the Health and Safety Code, to amend Section 2795 of, to add Article 3 (commencing with Section 4050) to Chapter 2 of Part 1 of Division 4 of, and to add Section 4123 to, the Public Resources Code, relating to public resources, and making an appropriation therefor, to take effect immediately, bill related to the budget.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Public resources: omnibus trailer bill.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-06-17 - Senate - Unfinished Business SB85 B. & F.R. (M (Y: 27 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-17 - Assembly - SB 85 B. & F. R. Senate Third Reading By TING (Y: 55 N: 19 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-17 - Senate - Unfinished Business SB85 B. & F.R. (Mitchell) Concurrence (Y: 28 N: 11 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-11 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB85 B. & F.R (Y: 27 N: 9 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-06-27 Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 31, Statutes of 2019.
2019-06-27 Approved by the Governor.
2019-06-25SenateEnrolled and presented to the Governor at 10 a.m.
2019-06-17SenateAssembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 28. Noes 11. Page 1599.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
2019-06-17SenateIn Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending.
2019-06-17AssemblyRead third time. Passed. (Ayes 55. Noes 19. Page 2303.) Ordered to the Senate.
2019-06-17AssemblyAssembly Rule 63 and 96 suspended. (Ayes 59. Noes 12. Page 2297.)
2019-06-17AssemblyOrdered to third reading.
2019-06-17AssemblyWithdrawn from committee.
2019-06-11AssemblyFrom committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on BUDGET.
2019-05-02AssemblyReferred to Com. on BUDGET.
2019-04-11AssemblyIn Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
2019-04-11SenateRead third time. Passed. (Ayes 27. Noes 9. Page 666.) Ordered to the Assembly.
2019-04-09SenateRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2019-04-08SenateOrdered to second reading.
2019-04-08SenateWithdrawn from committee. (Ayes 28. Noes 10. Page 582.)
2019-01-24SenateReferred to Com. on B. & F.R.
2019-01-11SenateFrom printer. May be acted upon on or after February 10.
2019-01-10SenateIntroduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.

Code Citations

ChapterSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Food and Agricultural Code224Amended CodeCitation Text
Food and Agricultural Code49015Amended CodeCitation Text
Fish and Game Code2787Amended CodeCitation Text
Fish and Game Code2791Amended CodeCitation Text
Fish and Game Code2796Amended CodeCitation Text
Health and Safety Code13108Amended CodeCitation Text
Health and Safety Code13146Amended CodeCitation Text
Health and Safety Code13146.1Amended CodeCitation Text
Health and Safety Code13146.2Amended CodeCitation Text
Health and Safety Code13146.3Amended CodeCitation Text
Health and Safety Code13146.6New CodeSee Bill Text
Health and Safety Code13217Amended CodeCitation Text
Health and Safety Code16022.5New CodeSee Bill Text
Health and Safety Code38591.2Amended CodeCitation Text
Health and Safety Code43019Amended CodeCitation Text
Health and Safety Code43019.1Amended CodeCitation Text
Health and Safety Code43019.2Amended CodeCitation Text
Health and Safety Code44391.4New CodeSee Bill Text
Public Resources Code2795Amended CodeCitation Text
Public Resources Code4050New CodeSee Bill Text

California State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback