CA SB845 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on May 3 2018 - 50% progression
Action: 2018-08-24 - Re-referred to Com. on APPR. pursuant to Assembly Rule 96.
Pending: Assembly Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

An act to add Chapter 4.6 (commencing with Section 116765) to Part 12 of Division 104 of the Health and Safety Code, relating to water, and making an appropriation therefor.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Safe and Affordable Drinking Water Fund.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-05-03 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB845 B. & F.R (Y: 24 N: 11 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-08-24AssemblyRe-referred to Com. on APPR. pursuant to Assembly Rule 96.
2018-08-22AssemblyFrom committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on RLS.
2018-08-20AssemblyRe-referred to Com. on RLS. pursuant to Assembly Rule 96.
2018-08-16AssemblyFrom committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on BUDGET.
2018-08-13AssemblyRe-referred to Com. on BUDGET pursuant to Assembly Rule 97.
2018-06-14AssemblyOrdered to third reading.
2018-06-14AssemblyWithdrawn from committee.
2018-06-14AssemblyAssembly Rule 96 suspended. (Ayes 55. Noes 24. Page 5802.)
2018-06-12AssemblyFrom committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on BUDGET.
2018-05-07AssemblyReferred to Com. on BUDGET.
2018-05-03AssemblyIn Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
2018-05-03SenateRead third time. Passed. (Ayes 24. Noes 11. Page 4920.) Ordered to the Assembly.
2018-05-01SenateRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2018-04-30SenateOrdered to second reading.
2018-04-30SenateWithdrawn from committee. (Ayes 25. Noes 11. Page 4865.)
2018-01-16SenateReferred to Com. on B. & F.R.
2018-01-11SenateFrom printer. May be acted upon on or after February 10.
2018-01-10SenateIntroduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.

Code Citations

ChapterSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Education Code69519Amended CodeCitation Text
Family Code17566New CodeSee Bill Text
Family Code17705Repealed CodeCitation Text
Government Code6253.2Amended CodeCitation Text
Health and Safety Code116765New CodeSee Bill Text
Health and Safety Code1531.6Repealed CodeCitation Text
Health and Safety Code1538.75Repealed CodeCitation Text
Labor Code246Amended CodeCitation Text
Welfare and Institutions Code10072.3Repealed CodeCitation Text
Welfare and Institutions Code10553.1Amended CodeCitation Text
Welfare and Institutions Code10823.1New CodeSee Bill Text
Welfare and Institutions Code10823.2New CodeSee Bill Text
Welfare and Institutions Code11325.23Amended CodeCitation Text
Welfare and Institutions Code11364Amended CodeCitation Text
Welfare and Institutions Code11387Amended CodeCitation Text
Welfare and Institutions Code11405Amended CodeCitation Text
Welfare and Institutions Code11450Amended CodeCitation Text
Welfare and Institutions Code11450.021New CodeSee Bill Text
Welfare and Institutions Code11450.022New CodeSee Bill Text
Welfare and Institutions Code11450.026New CodeSee Bill Text
Welfare and Institutions Code11453.01New CodeSee Bill Text
Welfare and Institutions Code11461.36New CodeSee Bill Text
Welfare and Institutions Code11462.04Amended CodeCitation Text
Welfare and Institutions Code12201.01New CodeSee Bill Text
Welfare and Institutions Code12301.6Amended CodeCitation Text
Welfare and Institutions Code14132.97Amended CodeCitation Text
Welfare and Institutions Code14132.971New CodeSee Bill Text
Welfare and Institutions Code16121Amended CodeCitation Text
Welfare and Institutions Code16521.7New CodeSee Bill Text
Welfare and Institutions Code18900.5New CodeSee Bill Text
Welfare and Institutions Code18900.6New CodeSee Bill Text
Welfare and Institutions Code18900.7New CodeSee Bill Text
Welfare and Institutions Code18941Amended CodeCitation Text
Welfare and Institutions Code9719.5Amended CodeCitation Text

California State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback