CA SB844 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on June 27 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-06-27 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 34, Statutes of 2016.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on June 27 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-06-27 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 34, Statutes of 2016.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to add Chapter 3.132 (commencing with Section 15820.94) to Part 10b of Division 3 of Title 2 of the Government Code, relating to correctional facilities, and making an appropriation therefor, to take effect immediately, bill related to the budget.
Title
Correctional facilities: construction: financing.
Sponsors
No sponsor information available at this time. |
Roll Calls
2016-06-15 - Senate - Unfinished Business Su p 1SB844 Committee O n B. & F.R.(Leno) Concurrence (Y: 32 N: 6 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-06-15 - Assembly - SB 844 B.& F. R. Senate Third Reading By TING (Y: 79 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2016-04-14 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB844 Committee On B. & F.R. (Leno) (Y: 25 N: 11 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-06-15 - Assembly - SB 844 B.& F. R. Senate Third Reading By TING (Y: 79 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2016-04-14 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB844 Committee On B. & F.R. (Leno) (Y: 25 N: 11 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-06-27 | Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 34, Statutes of 2016. | |
2016-06-27 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2016-06-16 | Senate | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 5:30 p.m. |
2016-06-15 | Senate | Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 32. Noes 6. Page 4340.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling. |
2016-06-15 | Senate | In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending. |
2016-06-15 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 79. Noes 0. Page 5362.) Ordered to the Senate. |
2016-06-15 | Assembly | Assembly Rule 96 suspended. (Ayes 50. Noes 25. Page 5358.) Withdrawn from committee. Ordered to third reading. Assembly Rule 63 suspended. (Ayes 50. Noes 25. Page 5358.) |
2016-06-12 | Assembly | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on BUDGET. |
2016-05-25 | Assembly | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on BUDGET. |
2016-05-02 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on BUDGET. |
2016-04-14 | Assembly | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. |
2016-04-14 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 25. Noes 11. Page 3542.) Ordered to the Assembly. |
2016-04-12 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2016-04-11 | Senate | Withdrawn from committee. Ordered to second reading. |
2016-01-11 | Senate | Referred to Com. on B. & F.R. |
2016-01-08 | Senate | From printer. May be acted upon on or after February 7. |
2016-01-07 | Senate | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Government Code | 15820.94 | New Code | See Bill Text |