CA SB844 | 2009-2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Introduced on January 11 2010 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-04-22 - Hearing postponed by committee.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 11 2010 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-04-22 - Hearing postponed by committee.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to add Sections 9143.5, 9145, 10247.5, 13335.3, and 13335.5 to the Government Code, relating to state finance.
Title
State finance: budget process.
Sponsors
No sponsor information available at this time. |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-04-22 | Hearing postponed by committee. | |
2010-04-16 | Set for hearing April 26. | |
2010-04-12 | Set, first hearing. Testimony taken. Further hearing to be set. | |
2010-04-08 | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time. Amended. Re-referred to Com. on B. & F.R. | |
2010-03-26 | Set for hearing April 12. | |
2010-03-25 | Re-referred to Com. on B. & F.R. | |
2010-03-18 | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time. Amended. Re-referred to Com. on RLS. | |
2010-01-21 | To Com. on RLS. | |
2010-01-12 | From print. May be acted upon on or after February 11. | |
2010-01-11 | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |