CA SB842 | 2009-2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-2)
Status: Passed on August 23 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-08-23 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 171, Statutes of 2010.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-2)
Status: Passed on August 23 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-08-23 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 171, Statutes of 2010.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to validate the organization, boundaries, acts, proceedings, and bonds of public bodies, and to provide limitations of time in which actions may be commenced, and declaring the urgency thereof, to take effect immediately.
Title
Validations.
Sponsors
Sen. Samuel Aanestad [R] | Sen. Dave Cox [R] | Sen. Christine Kehoe [D] | Sen. Curren Price [D] |
Sen. Patricia Wiggins [D] | Sen. Lois Wolk [D] |
Roll Calls
2010-08-09 - Assembly - SB 842 L. GOV. Senate Third Reading By SMYTH (Y: 78 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-04-07 - Assembly - Do pass, to Consent Calendar (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-03-11 - Senate - Consent Calendar 2nd SB842 Committee on L.Gov (Wiggins) (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-03-03 - Senate - Do pass and be placed on the Consent Calendar (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-04-07 - Assembly - Do pass, to Consent Calendar (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-03-11 - Senate - Consent Calendar 2nd SB842 Committee on L.Gov (Wiggins) (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-03-03 - Senate - Do pass and be placed on the Consent Calendar (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-08-23 | Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 171, Statutes of 2010. | |
2010-08-23 | Approved by Governor. | |
2010-08-13 | Enrolled. To Governor at 2 p.m. | |
2010-08-10 | In Senate. To enrollment. | |
2010-08-09 | Read third time. Urgency clause adopted. Passed. (Ayes 78. Noes 0. Page 6103.) To Senate. | |
2010-08-03 | From inactive file to third reading file. | |
2010-08-02 | Notice of motion to remove from inactive file given by Assembly Member Charles Calderon. | |
2010-04-12 | Read second time. To Consent Calendar. From Consent Calendar to third reading. Placed on inactive file on request of Assembly Member Charles Calderon. | |
2010-04-08 | From committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (Heard in committee on April 7.) | |
2010-03-18 | To Com. on L. GOV. | |
2010-03-11 | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. | |
2010-03-11 | Read third time. Urgency clause adopted. Passed. (Ayes 31. Noes 0. Page 2931.) To Assembly. | |
2010-03-04 | Read second time. To Consent Calendar. | |
2010-03-03 | From committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 4. Noes 0. Page 2901.) | |
2010-02-11 | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time. Amended. Re-referred to Com. on L. GOV. | |
2010-01-28 | Set for hearing March 3. | |
2010-01-21 | To Com. on L. GOV. | |
2010-01-12 | From print. May be acted upon on or after February 11. | |
2010-01-11 | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |