CA SB840 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on September 13 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-09-13 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 341, Statutes of 2016.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on September 13 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-09-13 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 341, Statutes of 2016.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Section 51013.1 of, and to add Section 51015.6 to, the Government Code, to amend Section 44273 of the Health and Safety Code, to amend Section 1546.1 of the Penal Code, to amend Sections 3401 and 25751 of the Public Resources Code, and to amend Sections 388 and 399.20 of, to add Section 784.1 to, to add and repeal Section 388.2 of, and to repeal Section 2834 of, the Public Utilities Code, relating to energy, and making an appropriation therefor, to take effect immediately, bill related to the budget.
Title
Public resources: energy.
Sponsors
No sponsor information available at this time. |
Roll Calls
2016-08-22 - Senate - Unfinished Business SB840 Committee On B. & F.R. (Leno) Concurrence (Y: 26 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-06-16 - Assembly - SB 840 B.& F. R. Senate Third Reading By TING (Y: 53 N: 23 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2016-04-14 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB840 Committee On B. & F.R. (Leno) (Y: 25 N: 11 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-06-16 - Assembly - SB 840 B.& F. R. Senate Third Reading By TING (Y: 53 N: 23 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2016-04-14 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB840 Committee On B. & F.R. (Leno) (Y: 25 N: 11 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-09-13 | Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 341, Statutes of 2016. | |
2016-09-13 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2016-08-26 | Senate | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 12:30 p.m. |
2016-08-22 | Senate | Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 26. Noes 13. Page 5239.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling. |
2016-06-16 | Senate | In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending. |
2016-06-16 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 53. Noes 23. Page 5390.) Ordered to the Senate. |
2016-06-15 | Assembly | Assembly Rule 96 suspended. (Ayes 50. Noes 25. Page 5358.) Withdrawn from committee. Ordered to third reading. Assembly Rule 63 suspended. (Ayes 50. Noes 25. Page 5358.) |
2016-06-14 | Assembly | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on BUDGET. |
2016-05-25 | Assembly | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on BUDGET. |
2016-05-02 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on BUDGET. |
2016-04-14 | Assembly | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. |
2016-04-14 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 25. Noes 11. Page 3541.) Ordered to the Assembly. |
2016-04-12 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2016-04-11 | Senate | Withdrawn from committee. Ordered to second reading. |
2016-01-11 | Senate | Referred to Com. on B. & F.R. |
2016-01-08 | Senate | From printer. May be acted upon on or after February 7. |
2016-01-07 | Senate | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Government Code | 51013.1 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Government Code | 51015.6 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Health and Safety Code | 44273 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Penal Code | 1546.1 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Public Resources Code | 25751 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Public Resources Code | 3401 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Public Utilities Code | 388 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Public Utilities Code | 388.2 | Repealed Code | Citation Text |
Public Utilities Code | 399.20 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Public Utilities Code | 784.1 | New Code | See Bill Text |