CA SB839 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 10 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-05-19 - May 19 hearing: Held in committee and under submission.
Pending: Senate Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 10 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-05-19 - May 19 hearing: Held in committee and under submission.
Pending: Senate Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to add Section 380.6 to, and to repeal Section 740.10 of, the Public Utilities Code, relating to electricity.
Title
Electricity: demand response.
Sponsors
Sen. Bill Dodd [D] |
Roll Calls
2022-04-04 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-03-14 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-03-14 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-05-19 | Senate | May 19 hearing: Held in committee and under submission. |
2022-05-13 | Senate | Set for hearing May 19. |
2022-04-04 | Senate | April 4 hearing: Placed on APPR suspense file. |
2022-03-25 | Senate | Set for hearing April 4. |
2022-03-21 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2022-03-17 | Senate | From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 12. Noes 0. Page 3094.) (March 14). |
2022-03-04 | Senate | Set for hearing March 14. |
2022-03-03 | Senate | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on E., U. & C. |
2022-02-07 | Senate | Joint Rule 55 suspended. (Ayes 31. Noes 6. Page 2880.) |
2022-02-07 | Senate | (Ayes 31. Noes 6.) |
2022-02-07 | Senate | Art. IV. Sec. 8(a) of the Constitution dispensed with. |
2022-01-19 | Senate | Referred to Com. on E., U. & C. |
2022-01-11 | Senate | From printer. May be acted upon on or after February 10. |
2022-01-10 | Senate | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Public Utilities Code | 380.6 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Public Utilities Code | 740.10 | Repealed Code | Citation Text |