CA SB835 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-1)
Status: Enrolled on August 30 2018 - 75% progression
Action: 2018-09-10 - Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4 p.m.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

An act to add Section 5008.10 to the Public Resources Code, relating to parks.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Parks: smoking ban.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-08-30 - Senate - Unfinished Business SB835 Glazer et al. Concurrence (Y: 26 N: 11 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-08-29 - Assembly - SB 835 Glazer Senate Third Reading By LEVINE (Y: 55 N: 25 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-08-16 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 12 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-12 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 10 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-29 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB835 Glazer et al (Y: 26 N: 11 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-25 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-16 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-13 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 6 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-09-10SenateEnrolled and presented to the Governor at 4 p.m.
2018-08-30SenateAssembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 25. Noes 11.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
2018-08-29SenateIn Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending.
2018-08-29AssemblyRead third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate.
2018-08-23AssemblyOrdered to third reading.
2018-08-23AssemblyRead third time and amended.
2018-08-21AssemblyRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2018-08-20AssemblyRead second time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
2018-08-16AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 12. Noes 5.) (August 16).
2018-06-27AssemblyJune 27 set for first hearing. Placed on APPR. suspense file.
2018-06-12AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 10. Noes 5.) (June 12). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2018-06-04AssemblyReferred to Com. on W.,P., & W.
2018-05-29AssemblyIn Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
2018-05-29SenateRead third time. Passed. (Ayes 26. Noes 11. Page 4344.) Ordered to the Assembly.
2018-05-25SenateRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2018-05-25SenateFrom committee: Do pass. (Ayes 5. Noes 2. Page 4298.) (May 25).
2018-05-18SenateSet for hearing May 25.
2018-04-16SenateApril 16 hearing: Placed on APPR. suspense file.
2018-04-09SenateSet for hearing April 16.
2018-03-20SenateRead second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2018-03-19SenateFrom committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 6. Noes 2. Page 4366.) (March 13).
2018-03-05SenateFrom committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on N.R. & W.
2018-02-23SenateSet for hearing March 13.
2018-01-16SenateReferred to Com. on N.R. & W.
2018-01-05SenateFrom printer. May be acted upon on or after February 4.
2018-01-04SenateIntroduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.

Code Citations

ChapterSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Public Resources Code5008.10New CodeSee Bill Text
Public Resources Code5008.9New CodeSee Bill Text

California State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback