CA SB834 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-0)
Status: Passed on September 8 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-09-08 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 309, Statutes of 2018.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

An act to add Section 6245 to the Public Resources Code, relating to state lands.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

State lands: leasing: oil and gas.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-08-29 - Senate - Unfinished Business SB834 Jackson et al. Concurrence (Y: 28 N: 7 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-08-27 - Assembly - SB 834 Jackson Senate Third Reading By MURATSUCHI (Y: 45 N: 25 NV: 10 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-08-16 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 12 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-25 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 7 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-30 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB834 Jackson et al (Y: 24 N: 8 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-25 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 5 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-30 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-16 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 6 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-09-08 Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 309, Statutes of 2018.
2018-09-08 Approved by the Governor.
2018-09-05SenateEnrolled and presented to the Governor at 3:30 p.m.
2018-08-29SenateAssembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 28. Noes 7. Page 5933.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
2018-08-28SenateIn Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending.
2018-08-27AssemblyRead third time. Passed. (Ayes 45. Noes 25. Page 6670.) Ordered to the Senate.
2018-08-24AssemblyOrdered to third reading.
2018-08-24AssemblyRead third time and amended.
2018-08-20AssemblyRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2018-08-16AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass. (Ayes 12. Noes 5.) (August 16).
2018-08-08AssemblyAugust 8 set for first hearing. Placed on APPR. suspense file.
2018-06-26AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 3.) (June 25). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2018-06-11AssemblyReferred to Com. on NAT. RES.
2018-05-31AssemblyIn Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
2018-05-30SenateRead third time. Passed. (Ayes 24. Noes 8. Page 4316.) Ordered to the Assembly.
2018-05-29SenateRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2018-05-25SenateRead second time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
2018-05-25SenateFrom committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 5. Noes 1. Page 4298.) (May 25).
2018-05-18SenateSet for hearing May 25.
2018-04-30SenateApril 30 hearing: Placed on APPR. suspense file.
2018-04-24SenateSet for hearing April 30.
2018-04-18SenateRead second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2018-04-17SenateFrom committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 6. Noes 2. Page 4698.) (April 16).
2018-03-14SenateSet for hearing April 16.
2018-01-16SenateReferred to Com. on N.R. & W.
2018-01-05SenateFrom printer. May be acted upon on or after February 4.
2018-01-04SenateIntroduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.

Code Citations

ChapterSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Public Resources Code6245New CodeSee Bill Text

California State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback