CA SB832 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (? 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on June 18 2020 - 50% progression
Action: 2020-08-31 - Ordered to third reading.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

An act to amend Section 704.730 of the Code of Civil Procedure, relating to enforcement of judgments.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Debtor exemptions: homestead exemption.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-06-18 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB832 B. & F.R (Y: 29 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-08-31AssemblyOrdered to third reading.
2020-08-31AssemblyWithdrawn from committee.
2020-08-31AssemblyAssembly Rule 96 and 63 suspended.
2020-08-28AssemblyFrom committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on BUDGET.
2020-08-27AssemblyFrom committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on BUDGET.
2020-06-18AssemblyReferred to Com. on BUDGET.
2020-06-18AssemblyIn Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
2020-06-18SenateRead third time. Passed. (Ayes 29. Noes 11. Page 3742.) Ordered to the Assembly.
2020-03-10SenateRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2020-03-09SenateOrdered to second reading.
2020-03-09SenateWithdrawn from committee. (Ayes 28. Noes 10. Page 3366.)
2020-01-22SenateReferred to Com. on B. & F.R.
2020-01-13SenateRead first time.
2020-01-13SenateFrom printer. May be acted upon on or after February 12.
2020-01-10SenateIntroduced. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.

Code Citations

ChapterSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Code of Civil Procedure704.730Amended CodeCitation Text

California State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback