CA SB830 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-1)
Status: Passed on September 17 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-09-17 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 448, Statutes of 2018.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

An act to add Section 51206.4 to the Education Code, relating to pupil instruction.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Pupil instruction: media literacy: resources.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-08-28 - Senate - Unfinished Business SB830 Dodd et al. Concurrence (Y: 28 N: 11 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-08-27 - Assembly - SB 830 Dodd Senate Third Reading By MULLIN (Y: 72 N: 2 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-08-16 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 12 N: 1 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-27 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-30 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB830 Dodd et al (Y: 25 N: 13 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-25 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-16 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-14 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 4 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-09-17 Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 448, Statutes of 2018.
2018-09-17 Approved by the Governor.
2018-09-05SenateEnrolled and presented to the Governor at 3:30 p.m.
2018-08-28SenateAssembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 28. Noes 11. Page 5872.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
2018-08-28SenateIn Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending.
2018-08-27AssemblyRead third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate.
2018-08-21AssemblyRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2018-08-20AssemblyRead second time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
2018-08-16AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 12. Noes 1.) (August 16).
2018-08-08AssemblyAugust 8 set for first hearing. Placed on APPR. suspense file.
2018-06-28AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 0.) (June 27). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2018-06-11AssemblyReferred to Com. on ED.
2018-05-31AssemblyIn Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
2018-05-30SenateRead third time. Passed. (Ayes 25. Noes 13. Page 4397.) Ordered to the Assembly.
2018-05-29SenateRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2018-05-25SenateRead second time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
2018-05-25SenateFrom committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 5. Noes 2. Page 4298.) (May 25).
2018-05-18SenateSet for hearing May 25.
2018-04-16SenateApril 16 hearing: Placed on APPR. suspense file.
2018-04-09SenateSet for hearing April 16.
2018-03-21SenateRead second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2018-03-20SenateFrom committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 4. Noes 2. Page 4375.) (March 14).
2018-02-27SenateSet for hearing March 14.
2018-01-16SenateReferred to Com. on ED.
2018-01-04SenateFrom printer. May be acted upon on or after February 3.
2018-01-03SenateIntroduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.

Code Citations

ChapterSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Education Code51206.4New CodeSee Bill Text

California State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback