CA SB83 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 11-4)
Status: Engrossed on May 13 2013 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2013-06-12 - From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on BUDGET.
Pending: Assembly Budget Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on May 13 2013 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2013-06-12 - From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on BUDGET.
Pending: Assembly Budget Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Sections 4418.25, 4474.2, 4519.5, 4648, 4785, 4801, 6500, and 6509 of, to add Sections 4519.6, 4659.1, and 4806 to, and to add and repeal Section 4648.01 of, the Welfare and Institutions Code, relating to developmental services, and making an appropriation therefor, to take effect immediately, bill related to the budget.
Title
Developmental services.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-05-13 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB83 Committee on B. & F.R. (Leno) (Y: 24 N: 9 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-06-12 | Assembly | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on BUDGET. |
2013-05-24 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on BUDGET. |
2013-05-13 | Assembly | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. |
2013-05-13 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 24. Noes 9. Page 894.) Ordered to the Assembly. |
2013-05-09 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2013-05-08 | Senate | Withdrawn from committee. Ordered to second reading. |
2013-01-24 | Senate | Referred to Com. on RLS. |
2013-01-11 | Senate | From printer. May be acted upon on or after February 10. |
2013-01-10 | Senate | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. (Corrected May 9). |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Welfare and Institutions Code | 4418.25 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Welfare and Institutions Code | 4474.2 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Welfare and Institutions Code | 4519.5 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Welfare and Institutions Code | 4519.6 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Welfare and Institutions Code | 4648 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Welfare and Institutions Code | 4648.01 | Repealed Code | Citation Text |
Welfare and Institutions Code | 4659.1 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Welfare and Institutions Code | 4785 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Welfare and Institutions Code | 4801 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Welfare and Institutions Code | 4806 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Welfare and Institutions Code | 6500 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Welfare and Institutions Code | 6509 | Amended Code | Citation Text |