CA SB829 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-2)
Status: Vetoed on September 30 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-09-30 - In Senate. Consideration of Governor's veto pending.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

An act to amend Sections 26001 and 26153 of, and to add Section 26071 to, the Business and Professions Code, and to amend Sections 34010, 34011, and 34012 of, to add Section 34012.1 to, and to add and repeal Section 6414 of, the Revenue and Taxation Code, relating to cannabis, and declaring the urgency thereof, to take effect immediately.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Cannabis: donations.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-08-31 - Senate - Unfinished Business SB829 Wiener et al. Urgency Clause Concurrence (Y: 35 N: 2 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-08-30 - Senate - That the Assembly amendments be concurred in (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-08-29 - Assembly - SB 829 Wiener Third Reading Urgency By WOOD (Y: 73 N: 3 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-08-16 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-25 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 8 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-19 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Revenue and Taxation] (Y: 13 N: 1 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-07 - Assembly - Be re-referred to the Committees on [Business and Professions] and [Revenue and Taxation] (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-17 - Senate - Consent Calendar SB829 (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-09 - Senate - Do pass and be ordered to the Consent Calendar (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-17 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Judiciary] (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-09-30 In Senate. Consideration of Governor's veto pending.
2018-09-30 Vetoed by the Governor.
2018-09-11SenateEnrolled and presented to the Governor at 4 p.m.
2018-08-31SenateAssembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 35. Noes 2. Page 6130.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
2018-08-31SenateUrgency clause adopted.
2018-08-30SenateFrom committee: That the Assembly amendments be concurred in. (Ayes 6. Noes 0. Page 6069.)
2018-08-30SenateFrom committee: Be re-referred to Com. on GOV. & F. pursuant to Senate Rule 29.10(d). (Ayes 5. Noes 0. Page 6028.) Re-referred to Com. on GOV. & F.
2018-08-30SenateRe-referred to Com. on RLS. pursuant to Senate Rule 29.10(d).
2018-08-29SenateIn Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending.
2018-08-29AssemblyRead third time. Urgency clause adopted. Passed. (Ayes 73. Noes 3. Page 6769.) Ordered to the Senate.
2018-08-24AssemblyOrdered to third reading.
2018-08-24AssemblyRead third time and amended.
2018-08-21AssemblyRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2018-08-20AssemblyRead second time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
2018-08-16AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 12. Noes 0.) (August 16).
2018-08-08AssemblyAugust 8 set for first hearing. Placed on APPR. suspense file.
2018-07-03AssemblyRead second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2018-07-02AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 8. Noes 1.) (June 25).
2018-06-19AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on REV. & TAX. (Ayes 13. Noes 1.) (June 19). Re-referred to Com. on REV. & TAX.
2018-06-13AssemblyFrom committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on B. & P.
2018-06-07AssemblyFrom committee: Be re-referred to Coms. on B. & P. and REV. & TAX. (Ayes 6. Noes 0.) (June 7). Re-referred to Com. on B. & P.
2018-05-25AssemblyFrom committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on RLS.
2018-05-25AssemblyReferred to Com. on RLS.
2018-05-17AssemblyIn Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
2018-05-17SenateRead third time. Passed. (Ayes 38. Noes 0. Page 5089.) Ordered to the Assembly.
2018-05-10SenateRead second time. Ordered to consent calendar.
2018-05-09SenateFrom committee: Do pass. Ordered to consent calendar. (Ayes 6. Noes 0. Page 4994.) (May 9).
2018-05-04SenateSet for hearing May 9.
2018-05-03SenateRe-referred to Com. on ED.
2018-04-26SenateRe-referred to Com. on RLS.
2018-04-26SenateWithdrawn from committee.
2018-04-25SenateApril 24 set for first hearing canceled at the request of author.
2018-04-25SenateFrom committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on JUD.
2018-04-19SenateSet for hearing April 24.
2018-04-18SenateFrom committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on JUD. (Ayes 13. Noes 0. Page 4723.) (April 17). Re-referred to Com. on JUD.
2018-04-11SenateSet for hearing April 17.
2018-04-09SenateFrom committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on T. & H.
2018-03-21SenateRe-referred to Coms. on T. & H. and JUD.
2018-03-14SenateFrom committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on RLS.
2018-01-16SenateReferred to Com. on RLS.
2018-01-04SenateFrom printer. May be acted upon on or after February 3.
2018-01-03SenateIntroduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.

Code Citations

ChapterSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Business and Professions Code26001Amended CodeCitation Text
Business and Professions Code26012Amended CodeCitation Text
Business and Professions Code26050Amended CodeCitation Text
Business and Professions Code26070Amended CodeCitation Text
Business and Professions Code26070.1Amended CodeCitation Text
Business and Professions Code26071New CodeSee Bill Text
Business and Professions Code26090Amended CodeCitation Text
Business and Professions Code26100Amended CodeCitation Text
Business and Professions Code26104Amended CodeCitation Text
Business and Professions Code26110Amended CodeCitation Text
Business and Professions Code26120Amended CodeCitation Text
Business and Professions Code26153Amended CodeCitation Text
Business and Professions Code26200Amended CodeCitation Text
Education Code8335Amended CodeCitation Text
Health and Safety Code17008Amended CodeCitation Text
Health and Safety Code17021.6Amended CodeCitation Text
Health and Safety Code17030.10New CodeSee Bill Text
Revenue and Taxation Code34010Amended CodeCitation Text
Revenue and Taxation Code34011Amended CodeCitation Text
Revenue and Taxation Code34012Amended CodeCitation Text
Revenue and Taxation Code34012.1New CodeSee Bill Text
Revenue and Taxation Code6359.5New CodeSee Bill Text
Revenue and Taxation Code6414Repealed CodeCitation Text

California State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback