CA SB827 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on January 29 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-07-03 - From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 11. Noes 0.) (July 2).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

An act to amend Sections 28840 and 28841 of, and to add Sections 28841.2 and 28841.4 to, the Public Utilities Code, relating to transportation.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

San Francisco Bay Area Rapid Transit District: Office of the BART Inspector General.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2024-07-02 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-06-17 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Judiciary] (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-01-29 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB827 Glazer (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-01-11 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-01-09 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Judiciary] (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-04-11 - Senate - [First] hearing set for [04-12-2023]: Failed passage in Committee. Reconsideration granted (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-04-11 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Judiciary] (Y: 7 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2024-07-03AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 11. Noes 0.) (July 2).
2024-06-24AssemblyFrom committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on JUD.
2024-06-18AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on JUD. (Ayes 15. Noes 0.) (June 17). Re-referred to Com. on JUD.
2024-05-13AssemblyReferred to Coms. on TRANS. and JUD.
2024-01-29AssemblyIn Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
2024-01-29SenateRead third time. Passed. (Ayes 39. Noes 0. Page 3055.) Ordered to the Assembly.
2024-01-16SenateRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2024-01-12SenateOrdered to second reading.
2024-01-12SenateWithdrawn from committee.
2024-01-11SenateFrom committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2024-01-11SenateFrom committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 10. Noes 0. Page 2980.) (January 11). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2024-01-10SenateFrom committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on JUD. (Ayes 15. Noes 0. Page 2971.) (January 9). Re-referred to Com. on JUD.
2024-01-04SenateSet for hearing January 11 in JUD. pending receipt.
2024-01-03SenateSet for hearing January 9.
2023-04-11SenateApril 11 set for first hearing. Failed passage in committee. (Ayes 7. Noes 1. Page 689.) Reconsideration granted.
2023-03-21SenateSet for hearing April 11.
2023-03-01SenateReferred to Coms. on TRANS. and JUD.
2023-02-21SenateFrom printer. May be acted upon on or after March 20.
2023-02-17SenateIntroduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.

Code Citations

ChapterSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Public Utilities Code28840Amended CodeCitation Text
Public Utilities Code28841Amended CodeCitation Text
Public Utilities Code28841.2New CodeSee Bill Text
Public Utilities Code28841.4New CodeSee Bill Text

California State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback