CA SB827 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Introduced on January 3 2018 - 25% progression
Action: 2018-04-19 - Set for hearing April 25 in GOV. & F. pending receipt.
Pending: Senate Transportation and Housing Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

An act to add Chapter 4.35 (commencing with Section 65918.5) to Division 1 of Title 7 of the Government Code, relating to land use.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Planning and zoning: transit-rich housing bonus.

Sponsors


Roll Calls


History

DateChamberAction
2018-04-19SenateSet for hearing April 25 in GOV. & F. pending receipt.
2018-04-18SenateApril 17 set for first hearing. Failed passage in committee. (Ayes 4. Noes 6. Page 4723.) Reconsideration granted.
2018-04-11SenateSet for hearing April 17.
2018-04-09SenateFrom committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on T. & H.
2018-03-01SenateFrom committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on T. & H.
2018-01-16SenateReferred to Coms. on T. & H. and GOV. & F.
2018-01-04SenateFrom printer. May be acted upon on or after February 3.
2018-01-03SenateIntroduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.

Code Citations

ChapterSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Government Code65917.7New CodeSee Bill Text
Government Code65918.5New CodeSee Bill Text

California State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback