CA SB826 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Passed on September 30 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-09-30 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 954, Statutes of 2018.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

An act to add Sections 301.3 and 2115.5 to the Corporations Code, relating to corporations.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Corporations: boards of directors.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-08-30 - Senate - Unfinished Business SB826 Jackson et al. Concurrence (Y: 23 N: 9 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-08-29 - Assembly - SB 826 Jackson Senate Third Reading By GONZALEZ FLETCHER (Y: 41 N: 26 NV: 13 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-08-16 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-26 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 7 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-25 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Judiciary] (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-31 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB826 Jackson et al (Y: 22 N: 11 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-25 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-07 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-24 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-24 - Senate - [04-25-2018] set for [First] hearing: Reconsideration of favorable vote granted (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-24 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 5 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-18 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Judiciary] (Y: 5 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-09-30 Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 954, Statutes of 2018.
2018-09-30 Approved by the Governor.
2018-09-10SenateEnrolled and presented to the Governor at 4 p.m.
2018-08-30SenateAssembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 23. Noes 9. Page 6024.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
2018-08-29SenateIn Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending.
2018-08-29AssemblyRead third time. Passed. (Ayes 41. Noes 26. Page 6774.) Ordered to the Senate.
2018-08-21AssemblyRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2018-08-20AssemblyRead second time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
2018-08-16AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 12. Noes 0.) (August 16).
2018-08-08AssemblyAugust 8 set for first hearing. Placed on APPR. suspense file.
2018-06-26AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 1.) (June 26). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2018-06-26AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on JUD. (Ayes 8. Noes 0.) (June 25). Re-referred to Com. on JUD.
2018-06-21AssemblyAssembly Rule 56 suspended.
2018-06-14AssemblyReferred to Coms. on B. & F. and JUD.
2018-05-31AssemblyIn Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
2018-05-31SenateRead third time. Passed. (Ayes 22. Noes 11. Page 4450.) Ordered to the Assembly.
2018-05-29SenateRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2018-05-25SenateRead second time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
2018-05-25SenateFrom committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 5. Noes 2. Page 4297.) (May 25).
2018-05-18SenateSet for hearing May 25.
2018-05-07SenateMay 7 hearing: Placed on APPR. suspense file.
2018-04-27SenateSet for hearing May 7.
2018-04-25SenateFrom committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 2. Page 4813.) (April 24). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2018-04-25SenateApril 24 set for first hearing. Reconsideration of favorable vote granted.
2018-04-25SenateFrom committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 1. Page 4813.) (April 24). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2018-04-20SenateSet for hearing April 24.
2018-04-19SenateFrom committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on JUD. (Ayes 5. Noes 1. Page 4744.) (April 18). Re-referred to Com. on JUD.
2018-04-03SenateFrom committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on B. & F.I.
2018-03-21SenateSet for hearing April 18.
2018-03-20SenateApril 4 set for first hearing canceled at the request of author.
2018-03-16SenateSet for hearing April 4.
2018-03-15SenateRe-referred to Coms. on B. & F.I. and JUD.
2018-03-15SenateRe-referred to Com. on RLS.
2018-03-15SenateWithdrawn from committee.
2018-01-16SenateReferred to Coms. on I., B. & F.I. and JUD.
2018-01-04SenateFrom printer. May be acted upon on or after February 3.
2018-01-03SenateIntroduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.

Code Citations

ChapterSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Corporations Code2115.5New CodeSee Bill Text
Corporations Code301.3New CodeSee Bill Text

California State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback