CA SB824 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 29 2018 - 50% progression
Action: 2018-06-28 - Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
Pending: Assembly Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

An act to amend Section 675.1 of, and to add Article 10.4 (commencing with Section 929) to Chapter 1 of Part 2 of Division 1 of, the Insurance Code, relating to insurance.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Insurers: declared disaster: homeowners’ insurance policies.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-06-26 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-20 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Judiciary] (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-29 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB824 Lara et al (Y: 27 N: 5 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-25 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 5 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-22 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-25 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-06-28AssemblyRead second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2018-06-27AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 8. Noes 0.) (June 26).
2018-06-20AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on JUD. (Ayes 8. Noes 0.) (June 20). Re-referred to Com. on JUD.
2018-06-07AssemblyReferred to Coms. on INS. and JUD.
2018-05-29AssemblyIn Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
2018-05-29SenateRead third time. Passed. (Ayes 27. Noes 5. Page 4343.) Ordered to the Assembly.
2018-05-25SenateRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2018-05-25SenateFrom committee: Do pass. (Ayes 5. Noes 1. Page 4297.) (May 25).
2018-05-23SenateSet for hearing May 25.
2018-05-22SenateMay 22 hearing: Placed on APPR. suspense file.
2018-05-14SenateSet for hearing May 22.
2018-05-02SenateRead second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2018-05-01SenateFrom committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 9. Noes 0. Page 4884.) (April 25).
2018-04-16SenateFrom committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on INS.
2018-04-04SenateSet for hearing April 25.
2018-04-02SenateApril 11 set for first hearing canceled at the request of author.
2018-03-23SenateSet for hearing April 11.
2018-03-15SenateRe-referred to Com. on INS.
2018-03-15SenateRe-referred to Com. on RLS.
2018-03-15SenateWithdrawn from committee.
2018-01-16SenateReferred to Com. on I., B. & F.I.
2018-01-04SenateFrom printer. May be acted upon on or after February 3.
2018-01-03SenateIntroduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.

Code Citations

ChapterSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Insurance Code675.1Amended CodeCitation Text
Insurance Code676Amended CodeCitation Text
Insurance Code758.8New CodeSee Bill Text
Insurance Code929New CodeSee Bill Text

California State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback