CA SB823 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Enrolled on August 31 2018 - 75% progression
Action: 2018-09-11 - Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4 p.m.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

An act to add Section 11834.015 to the Health and Safety Code, relating to public health.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Alcohol and drug treatment abuse recovery and treatment facilities.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-08-31 - Senate - Unfinished Business SB823 Hill Concurrence (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-08-31 - Senate - That the Assembly amendments be concurred in (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-08-30 - Assembly - SB 823 Hill Senate Third Reading By WOOD (Y: 80 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-08-16 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-26 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-21 - Assembly - Be re-referred to the Committee on [Health] (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-23 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB823 Hill et al (Y: 28 N: 7 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-10 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 5 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-09-11SenateEnrolled and presented to the Governor at 4 p.m.
2018-08-31SenateAssembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 38. Noes 0.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
2018-08-31SenateFrom committee: That the Assembly amendments be concurred in. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.)
2018-08-31SenateFrom committee: Be re-referred to Com. on HEALTH pursuant to Senate Rule 29.10(d) . (Ayes 5. Noes 0.) Re-referred to Com. on HEALTH.
2018-08-31SenateRe-referred to Com. on RLS. pursuant to Senate Rule 29.10(d).
2018-08-30SenateIn Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending.
2018-08-30AssemblyRead third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate.
2018-08-20AssemblyRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2018-08-16AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (August 16).
2018-08-08AssemblyAugust 8 set for first hearing. Placed on APPR. suspense file.
2018-07-02AssemblyRead second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2018-06-28AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 15. Noes 0.) (June 26).
2018-06-21AssemblyFrom committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on HEALTH.
2018-06-21AssemblyFrom committee: Be re-referred to Com. on HEALTH. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (June 21). Re-referred to Com. on HEALTH.
2018-06-18AssemblyRe-referred to Com. on RLS. pursuant to Assembly Rule 96.
2018-06-18AssemblyFrom committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on B. & F.
2018-06-06AssemblyJune 11 hearing postponed by committee.
2018-05-23AssemblyFrom committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on B. & F.
2018-04-30AssemblyReferred to Coms. on B. & F. and P. & C.P.
2018-04-23AssemblyIn Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
2018-04-23SenateRead third time. Passed. (Ayes 28. Noes 7. Page 4758.) Ordered to the Assembly.
2018-04-12SenateRead second time and amended. Ordered to third reading.
2018-04-11SenateFrom committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 5. Noes 1. Page 4625.) (April 10).
2018-03-22SenateSet for hearing April 10.
2018-03-05SenateFrom committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on JUD.
2018-01-16SenateReferred to Com. on JUD.
2018-01-04SenateFrom printer. May be acted upon on or after February 3.
2018-01-03SenateIntroduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.

Code Citations

ChapterSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Civil Code1785.11.2Amended CodeCitation Text
Civil Code1785.15Amended CodeCitation Text
Health and Safety Code11834.015New CodeSee Bill Text

California State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback