CA SB820 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on September 28 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-09-28 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 393, Statutes of 2021.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on September 28 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-09-28 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 393, Statutes of 2021.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Section 19620.15 of the Business and Professions Code, relating to horse racing.
Title
Horse racing: state-designated fairs: allocation of revenues: gross receipts for sales and use tax.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-09-10 - Senate - Unfinished Business SB820 G.O. (Dodd) Concurrence (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2021-09-09 - Assembly - SB 820 G.O. Senate Third Reading By BURKE (Y: 79 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-08-26 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-07-05 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-29 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Revenue and Taxation] with recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-01 - Senate - Special Consent SB820 G.O (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-20 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-10 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-22 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-23 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Governance and Finance] with the recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-09-09 - Assembly - SB 820 G.O. Senate Third Reading By BURKE (Y: 79 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-08-26 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-07-05 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-29 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Revenue and Taxation] with recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-01 - Senate - Special Consent SB820 G.O (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-20 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-10 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-22 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-23 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Governance and Finance] with the recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-09-28 | Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 393, Statutes of 2021. | |
2021-09-28 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2021-09-17 | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 1:30 p.m. | |
2021-09-10 | Senate | Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 37. Noes 0. Page 2614.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling. |
2021-09-09 | Senate | In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending. |
2021-09-09 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 79. Noes 0. Page 3012.) Ordered to the Senate. |
2021-08-31 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2021-08-30 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. Ordered to second reading. |
2021-08-26 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 16. Noes 0.) (August 26). |
2021-08-19 | Assembly | August 19 set for first hearing. Placed on suspense file. |
2021-07-06 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To consent calendar. (Ayes 11. Noes 0.) (July 5). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2021-06-29 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on REV. & TAX. with recommendation: To consent calendar. (Ayes 21. Noes 0.) (June 29). Re-referred to Com. on REV. & TAX. |
2021-06-10 | Assembly | Referred to Coms. on G.O. and REV. & TAX. |
2021-06-02 | Assembly | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. |
2021-06-01 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 39. Noes 0. Page 1348.) Ordered to the Assembly. |
2021-05-24 | Senate | Ordered to special consent calendar. |
2021-05-20 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2021-05-20 | Senate | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 1205.) (May 20). |
2021-05-14 | Senate | Set for hearing May 20. |
2021-05-10 | Senate | May 10 hearing: Placed on APPR suspense file. |
2021-04-30 | Senate | Set for hearing May 10. |
2021-04-27 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2021-04-26 | Senate | From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 0. Page 896.) (April 22). |
2021-04-13 | Senate | Set for hearing April 22. |
2021-03-23 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on GOV. & F. with recommendation: To consent calendar. (Ayes 14. Noes 0. Page 589.) (March 23). Re-referred to Com. on GOV. & F. |
2021-03-16 | Senate | Set for hearing March 23. |
2021-03-11 | Senate | Referred to Coms. on G.O. and GOV. & F. |
2021-03-04 | Senate | From printer. |
2021-03-03 | Senate | Article IV Section 8(a) of the Constitution and Joint Rule 55 dispensed with February 22, 2021, suspending the 30 calendar day requirement. |
2021-03-03 | Senate | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Business and Professions Code | 19620.15 | Amended Code | Citation Text |