CA SB820 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-3)
Status: Passed on September 26 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-09-26 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 353, Statutes of 2013.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-3)
Status: Passed on September 26 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-09-26 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 353, Statutes of 2013.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Sections 11003.4, 19821, 19841, 19861, 19864, 19876, 19912, 19951, and 19984 of the Business and Professions Code, to amend Sections 1916.12, 1918.5, and 5405 of the Civil Code, to amend Sections 14024, 14025, 14026, 14027, 14028, 14030.2, 14034, 14036, 14037, 14037.5, 14037.7, 14038, 14039, 14040, 14041, 14043, 14061, 14065, 14066, 14070, 14071, 14071.5, 14072, 14074, 14075, 14076, 14085, 14086, 29503, and 31004 of, and to amend the heading of Article 4 (commencing with Section 14025) of Chapter 1 of Part 5 of Division 3 of Title 1 of, the Corporations Code, to amend Sections 300, 301, 320, 326, 350, 353, 355, 4805.055, 5104, 12003, 14003, 14200.1, 14200.2, 17002, 18002, 22005, 30002, 31055, and 50003 of, and to repeal and add Sections 351 and 371 of, the Financial Code, to amend Sections 8684.2, 11532, 11534, 11538, 11539, 11540, 11541, 11544, 11546, 11549, 11549.1, 12802.8, 12856, 13995.20, 13995.60, 13995.64.5, 13995.65.5, 13995.92, 13997.7, 14030, 14534.1, 14998.3, 14998.4, 14998.6, 14998.7, 53108.5, 53113, 53114, 53114.2, 53115, 53115.2, 53115.3, 53116, 53119, 53120, 53661, 63021.5, 65040.12, 91550, and 99055 of, to amend the heading of Article 5 (commencing with Section 13995.50) of Chapter 1 of Part 4.7 of Division 3 of Title 2 of, and to add Section 12803.2 to, the Government Code, to amend Sections 71.4, 71.7, 72.6, 76.5, 76.6, 82, and 82.3 of the Harbors and Navigation Code, to amend Sections 40448.6 and 44272 of the Health and Safety Code, to amend Sections 326.3, 326.4, and 326.5 of the Penal Code, to amend Section 25464 of the Public Resources Code, to amend Section 41136 of the Revenue and Taxation Code, and to amend Sections 335, 10200, 10202.5, and 15002 of the Unemployment Insurance Code, relating to state government, and declaring the urgency thereof, to take effect immediately.
Title
State government.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-09-10 - Senate - Unfinished Business SB820 Committee on G.O. (Wright) Urgency Clause (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-09-09 - Assembly - SB 820 G.O. Third Reading Urgency By FRAZIER (Y: 77 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2013-08-08 - Assembly - SB 820 G.O. Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 77 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2013-07-03 - Assembly - Do pass, to Consent Calendar (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-06-19 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2013-05-09 - Senate - Consent Calendar 2nd SB820 Committee on G.O. (Wright) (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-04-23 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations Recommend Consent (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-09-09 - Assembly - SB 820 G.O. Third Reading Urgency By FRAZIER (Y: 77 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2013-08-08 - Assembly - SB 820 G.O. Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 77 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2013-07-03 - Assembly - Do pass, to Consent Calendar (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-06-19 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2013-05-09 - Senate - Consent Calendar 2nd SB820 Committee on G.O. (Wright) (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-04-23 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations Recommend Consent (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-09-26 | Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 353, Statutes of 2013. | |
2013-09-26 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2013-09-13 | Senate | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 2 p.m. |
2013-09-10 | Senate | Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 38. Noes 0. Page 2295.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling. (Corrected September 11). |
2013-09-09 | Senate | In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending. |
2013-09-09 | Assembly | Read third time. Urgency clause adopted. Passed. (Ayes 77. Noes 0. Page 2995.) Ordered to the Senate. |
2013-08-26 | Assembly | Read third time and amended. (Page 2700.) Ordered to third reading. |
2013-08-12 | Assembly | In Assembly. Held at Desk. Action rescinded whereby the bill was read third time, urgency clause adopted, passed, and ordered to the Senate. Ordered to third reading. |
2013-08-12 | Senate | In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending. Ordered to the Assembly. |
2013-08-08 | Assembly | Read third time. Urgency clause adopted. Passed. (Ayes 77. Noes 0. Page 2485.) Ordered to the Senate. |
2013-08-05 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar. |
2013-07-03 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. Ordered to consent calendar. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (July 3). |
2013-06-19 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 12. Noes 0.) (June 19). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2013-06-04 | Assembly | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on A. & A.R. |
2013-05-30 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on A. & A.R. |
2013-05-09 | Assembly | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. |
2013-05-09 | Senate | Read third time. Urgency clause adopted. Passed. (Ayes 34. Noes 0. Page 868.) Ordered to the Assembly. |
2013-05-07 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar. |
2013-05-06 | Senate | From committee: Be placed on second reading file pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8 and ordered to consent calendar. |
2013-04-29 | Senate | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2013-04-26 | Senate | Set for hearing May 6. |
2013-04-23 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To consent calendar. (Ayes 9. Noes 0. Page 640.) (April 23). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2013-04-19 | Senate | Set for hearing April 23. |
2013-04-18 | Senate | Re-referred to Com. on G.O. |
2013-04-15 | Senate | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on RLS. |
2013-03-21 | Senate | Referred to Com. on RLS. |
2013-03-15 | Senate | From printer. May be acted upon on or after April 14. |
2013-03-14 | Senate | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |