CA SB82 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on June 27 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-27 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 29, Statutes of 2019.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on June 27 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-27 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 29, Statutes of 2019.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Sections 23083.5, 23106, 23320.5, 23321.7, 23327, 23355.2, 23357.2, 23357.3, 23357.4, 23358.3, 23366.3, 23375, 23390, 23393.5, 23396.1, 23396.2, 23396.3, 23396.6, 23399, 23399.4, 23399.45, 23399.6, 23399.65, 23433, 23502, 23661.3, 23786, 23788.5, 23803, 23817.5, 23817.9, 23818, 23824, 23826.8, 23826.13, 23954.6, 23958.4, 23959, 23961, 24042, 24042.5, 24044.5, 24045, 24045.1, 24045.7, 24045.76, 24045.85, 24045.11, 24045.12, 24045.14, 24047, 24048, 24070, 24071, 24071.1, 24071.2, 24072.2, 25512, 25600.5, 25659.5, 25685, and 25761 of, to repeal Sections 23320.1, 23954.5, and 23954.7 of, and to repeal and add Sections 9873, 23320, and 24072 of, the Business and Professions Code, to amend Sections 1002 and 5019.5 of the Education Code, to amend Sections 9084, 9086, 19400, 19402, 21550, and 21552 of the Elections Code, to amend Sections 927.2, 927.6, 927.7, 927.13, 9112, 9125, 13073, 13073.5, 13300.5, 14678.7, 14692, 14932, 14934, 14936, 15805, 16351.5, 19825.5, 19849.7, 25501, 26203, 28084, 30061, 40200, 40231, 40236, 65057, and 65059 of, to amend, repeal, and add Section 11553 of, to add Sections 9113.5, 12815, 13073.6, 14670.10.5, and 14937 to, and to repeal Sections 16408 and 16409 of, the Government Code, to amend Sections 40220.5, 50801, 101180, and 124300 of, and to add Section 16010.5 to, the Health and Safety Code, to amend Sections 1012.2, 1023, and 1034 of, and to repeal Section 1031 of, the Military and Veterans Code, to amend Section 320.6 of the Penal Code, to amend Sections 20120 and 20123 of the Public Contract Code, to amend Section 48653 of the Public Resources Code, to amend Sections 792.5, 30207, 30222, and 99501 of the Public Utilities Code, to amend Sections 95.5, 11001.5, 11005.6, and 30462.1 of the Revenue and Taxation Code, to amend Sections 188.8 and 2107.2 of the Streets and Highways Code, and to amend Sections 4333, 5902, 11011 of, and to add Section 11011.1 to, the Welfare and Institutions Code, relating to state government, and making an appropriation therefor, to take effect immediately, bill related to the budget.
Title
State Government.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-06-17 - Assembly - SB 82 B. & F. R. Senate Third Reading By TING (Y: 59 N: 14 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-17 - Senate - Unfinished Business SB82 B. & F.R. (Mitchell) Concurrence (Y: 31 N: 8 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-11 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB82 B. & F.R (Y: 27 N: 9 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-17 - Senate - Unfinished Business SB82 B. & F.R. (Mitchell) Concurrence (Y: 31 N: 8 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-11 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB82 B. & F.R (Y: 27 N: 9 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-06-27 | Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 29, Statutes of 2019. | |
2019-06-27 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2019-06-25 | Senate | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 10 a.m. |
2019-06-17 | Senate | Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 31. Noes 8. Page 1597.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling. |
2019-06-17 | Senate | In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending. |
2019-06-17 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 59. Noes 14. Page 2301.) Ordered to the Senate. |
2019-06-17 | Assembly | Assembly Rule 63 and 96 suspended. (Ayes 59. Noes 12. Page 2297.) |
2019-06-17 | Assembly | Ordered to third reading. |
2019-06-17 | Assembly | Withdrawn from committee. |
2019-06-11 | Assembly | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on BUDGET. |
2019-05-02 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on BUDGET. |
2019-04-11 | Assembly | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. |
2019-04-11 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 27. Noes 9. Page 665.) Ordered to the Assembly. |
2019-04-09 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2019-04-08 | Senate | Ordered to second reading. |
2019-04-08 | Senate | Withdrawn from committee. (Ayes 28. Noes 10. Page 582.) |
2019-01-24 | Senate | Referred to Com. on B. & F.R. |
2019-01-11 | Senate | From printer. May be acted upon on or after February 10. |
2019-01-10 | Senate | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |