CA SB819 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Engrossed on June 18 2020 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-08-31 - Assembly Rule 63 suspended.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on June 18 2020 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-08-31 - Assembly Rule 63 suspended.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Sections 300, 320, 321, 326, and 351 of, to add Division 24 (commencing with Section 90000) to, and to repeal Section 371 of, the Financial Code, and to amend Section 11041 of the Government Code, relating to financial institutions.
Title
Financial institutions: regulation: Department of Financial Protection and Innovation.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-06-18 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB819 B. & F.R (Y: 29 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-08-31 | Assembly | Assembly Rule 63 suspended. |
2020-08-31 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2020-08-30 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 7. Noes 3.) (August 30). |
2020-08-25 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on B. & F. pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.2. |
2020-08-25 | Assembly | Ordered to third reading. |
2020-08-25 | Assembly | Read third time and amended. |
2020-08-24 | Assembly | Ordered to third reading. |
2020-08-24 | Assembly | Withdrawn from committee. |
2020-08-24 | Assembly | Assembly Rule 96 suspended. (Ayes 53. Noes 16. Page 5157.) |
2020-08-17 | Assembly | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on BUDGET. |
2020-06-18 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on BUDGET. |
2020-06-18 | Assembly | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. |
2020-06-18 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 29. Noes 11. Page 3738.) Ordered to the Assembly. |
2020-03-10 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2020-03-09 | Senate | Ordered to second reading. |
2020-03-09 | Senate | Withdrawn from committee. (Ayes 28. Noes 10. Page 3366.) |
2020-01-22 | Senate | Referred to Com. on B. & F.R. |
2020-01-13 | Senate | Read first time. |
2020-01-13 | Senate | From printer. May be acted upon on or after February 12. |
2020-01-10 | Senate | Introduced. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Financial Code | 300 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Financial Code | 320 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Financial Code | 321 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Financial Code | 326 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Financial Code | 351 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Financial Code | 371 | Repealed Code | Citation Text |
Financial Code | 90000 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Government Code | 11041 | Amended Code | Citation Text |