CA SB819 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Vetoed on September 21 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-09-21 - In Senate. Consideration of Governor's veto pending.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

An act to amend Section 959 of, and to add Section 748 to, the Public Utilities Code, relating to energy.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Electrical and gas corporations: rates.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-08-28 - Senate - Unfinished Business SB819 Hill et al. Concurrence (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-08-27 - Assembly - SB 819 Hill Senate Third Reading By EGGMAN (Y: 79 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-08-08 - Assembly - Do pass. To Consent Calendar (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-26 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-20 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Judiciary] (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-21 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB819 Hill et al (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-24 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-24 - Senate - [04-25-2018] set for [First] hearing: Reconsideration of favorable vote granted (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-24 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-17 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Judiciary] (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-09-21 In Senate. Consideration of Governor's veto pending.
2018-09-21 Vetoed by the Governor.
2018-09-05SenateEnrolled and presented to the Governor at 3:30 p.m.
2018-08-28SenateAssembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 39. Noes 0. Page 5875.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
2018-08-28SenateIn Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending.
2018-08-27AssemblyRead third time. Passed. (Ayes 79. Noes 0. Page 6585.) Ordered to the Senate.
2018-08-20AssemblyOrdered to third reading.
2018-08-20AssemblyRead third time and amended.
2018-08-16AssemblyOrdered to third reading.
2018-08-16AssemblyFrom consent calendar.
2018-08-09AssemblyRead second time. Ordered to consent calendar.
2018-08-08AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass. Ordered to consent calendar. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (August 8).
2018-06-27AssemblyRead second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2018-06-26AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (June 26).
2018-06-21AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on JUD. (Ayes 15. Noes 0.) (June 20). Re-referred to Com. on JUD.
2018-06-13AssemblyFrom committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on U. & E.
2018-05-31AssemblyReferred to Coms. on U. & E. and JUD.
2018-05-21AssemblyIn Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
2018-05-21SenateRead third time. Passed. (Ayes 39. Noes 0. Page 4229.) Ordered to the Assembly.
2018-05-15SenateRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2018-05-14SenateFrom committee: Be ordered to second reading pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8.
2018-05-04SenateSet for hearing May 14.
2018-04-25SenateFrom committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 4813.) (April 24). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2018-04-25SenateApril 24 set for first hearing. Reconsideration of favorable vote granted.
2018-04-25SenateFrom committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 6. Noes 0. Page 4812.) (April 24). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2018-04-19SenateSet for hearing April 24.
2018-04-18SenateFrom committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on JUD. (Ayes 10. Noes 0. Page 4717.) (April 17). Re-referred to Com. on JUD.
2018-04-09SenateFrom committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on E., U. & C.
2018-03-12SenateSet for hearing April 17.
2018-01-16SenateReferred to Coms. on E., U. & C. and JUD.
2018-01-04SenateFrom printer. May be acted upon on or after February 3.
2018-01-03SenateIntroduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.

Code Citations

ChapterSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Public Utilities Code748New CodeSee Bill Text
Public Utilities Code959Amended CodeCitation Text

California State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback