CA SB817 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 24 2023 - 50% progression
Action: 2023-07-11 - From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (July 11). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
Pending: Assembly Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on May 24 2023 - 50% progression
Action: 2023-07-11 - From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (July 11). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
Pending: Assembly Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Section 7423 of the Business and Professions Code, relating to professions.
Title
Barbering and cosmetology: application, examination, and licensing fees.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-07-11 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2023-05-24 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB817 Roth (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-03-27 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-05-24 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB817 Roth (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-03-27 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-07-11 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (July 11). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2023-06-01 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on B. & P. |
2023-05-25 | Assembly | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. |
2023-05-24 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 39. Noes 0. Page 1246.) Ordered to the Assembly. |
2023-04-11 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2023-04-10 | Senate | From committee: Be ordered to second reading pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8. |
2023-03-29 | Senate | Set for hearing April 10. |
2023-03-27 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 12. Noes 0. Page 535.) (March 27). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2023-03-06 | Senate | Set for hearing March 27. |
2023-03-01 | Senate | Referred to Com. on B., P. & E. D. |
2023-02-21 | Senate | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 20. |
2023-02-17 | Senate | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Business and Professions Code | 7423 | Amended Code | Citation Text |