CA SB817 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on July 23 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-07-23 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 142, Statutes of 2021.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on July 23 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-07-23 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 142, Statutes of 2021.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Sections 13140, 13140.5, 13140.6, and 13140.7 of the Health and Safety Code, relating to fire protection.
Title
Fire protection: Office of the State Fire Marshal: State Board of Fire Services: membership.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-07-15 - Assembly - SB 817 G.O. Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 70 N: 0 NV: 9 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-07-07 - Assembly - Do pass. To Consent Calendar (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-15 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-08 - Senate - Consent Calendar SB817 G.O (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-23 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with the recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-07-07 - Assembly - Do pass. To Consent Calendar (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-15 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-08 - Senate - Consent Calendar SB817 G.O (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-23 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with the recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-07-23 | Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 142, Statutes of 2021. | |
2021-07-23 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2021-07-20 | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4 p.m. | |
2021-07-15 | Senate | In Senate. Ordered to engrossing and enrolling. |
2021-07-15 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 70. Noes 0. Page 2374.) Ordered to the Senate. |
2021-07-08 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar. |
2021-07-07 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. Ordered to consent calendar. (Ayes 14. Noes 0.) (July 7). |
2021-06-15 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To consent calendar. (Ayes 6. Noes 0.) (June 15). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2021-05-13 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on E.M. |
2021-04-08 | Assembly | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. |
2021-04-08 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 38. Noes 0. Page 716.) Ordered to the Assembly. |
2021-04-06 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar. |
2021-04-05 | Senate | From committee: Be ordered to second reading pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8 and ordered to consent calendar. |
2021-03-24 | Senate | Set for hearing April 5. |
2021-03-23 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR with recommendation: To consent calendar. (Ayes 14. Noes 0. Page 588.) (March 23). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2021-03-16 | Senate | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on G.O. |
2021-03-16 | Senate | Set for hearing March 23. |
2021-03-11 | Senate | Referred to Com. on G.O. |
2021-03-04 | Senate | From printer. |
2021-03-03 | Senate | Article IV Section 8(a) of the Constitution and Joint Rule 55 dispensed with February 22, 2021, suspending the 30 calendar day requirement. |
2021-03-03 | Senate | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Health and Safety Code | 13140 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Health and Safety Code | 13140.5 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Health and Safety Code | 13140.6 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Health and Safety Code | 13140.7 | Amended Code | Citation Text |