CA SB817 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Vetoed on September 23 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-11-30 - Last day to consider Governor's veto pursuant to Joint Rule 58.5.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Status: Vetoed on September 23 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-11-30 - Last day to consider Governor's veto pursuant to Joint Rule 58.5.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Section 97.70 of the Revenue and Taxation Code, relating to local government finance.
Title
Local government finance: property tax revenue allocations: vehicle license fee adjustments.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-08-30 - Senate - Unfinished Business SB817 Roth Concurrence (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-08-22 - Assembly - SB 817 Roth Senate Third Reading By COOLEY (Y: 77 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2016-08-11 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-06-15 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2016-05-31 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB817 Roth (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-05-27 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-04-11 - Senate - Placed on Appropriations Suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-03-30 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-08-22 - Assembly - SB 817 Roth Senate Third Reading By COOLEY (Y: 77 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2016-08-11 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-06-15 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2016-05-31 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB817 Roth (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-05-27 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-04-11 - Senate - Placed on Appropriations Suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-03-30 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-11-30 | Last day to consider Governor's veto pursuant to Joint Rule 58.5. | |
2016-09-23 | In Senate. Consideration of Governor's veto pending. | |
2016-09-23 | Vetoed by the Governor. | |
2016-09-08 | Senate | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 5 p.m. |
2016-08-30 | Senate | Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 39. Noes 0. Page 5512.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling. |
2016-08-29 | Senate | In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending. |
2016-08-22 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 77. Noes 0. Page 6057.) Ordered to the Senate. |
2016-08-18 | Assembly | Read third time and amended. Ordered to third reading. |
2016-08-15 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2016-08-12 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 20. Noes 0.) (August 11). |
2016-06-29 | Assembly | June 29 set for first hearing. Placed on APPR. suspense file. |
2016-06-15 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 8. Noes 0.) (June 15). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2016-06-06 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on L. GOV. |
2016-06-01 | Assembly | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. |
2016-05-31 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 38. Noes 0. Page 4034.) Ordered to the Assembly. |
2016-05-27 | Senate | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 3998.) (May 27). Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2016-05-20 | Senate | Set for hearing May 27. |
2016-04-11 | Senate | April 11 hearing: Placed on APPR. suspense file. |
2016-04-01 | Senate | Set for hearing April 11. |
2016-03-30 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 3334.) (March 30). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2016-03-10 | Senate | Set for hearing March 30. |
2016-03-03 | Senate | Re-referred to Com. on GOV. & F. |
2016-02-22 | Senate | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on RLS. |
2016-01-28 | Senate | Referred to Com. on RLS. |
2016-01-06 | Senate | From printer. May be acted upon on or after February 5. |
2016-01-05 | Senate | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Revenue and Taxation Code | 97.70 | Amended Code | Citation Text |