CA SB816 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on September 24 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-09-24 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 292, Statutes of 2021.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

An act to amend Section 8561 of the Government Code, relating to emergency services.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Master Mutual Aid Agreement: tribes.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-09-09 - Assembly - SB 816 G.O. Senate Third Reading By RODRIGUEZ (Y: 79 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-06-15 - Assembly - Do pass. To Consent Calendar (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-29 - Senate - Consent Calendar SB816 G.O. (Dodd) (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-20 - Senate - Do pass and be ordered to the Consent Calendar (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-09-24 Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 292, Statutes of 2021.
2021-09-24 Approved by the Governor.
2021-09-17 Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 1:30 p.m.
2021-09-09SenateIn Senate. Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
2021-09-09AssemblyRead third time. Passed. (Ayes 72. Noes 0.) Ordered to the Senate.
2021-09-07AssemblyOrdered to third reading.
2021-09-07AssemblyFrom inactive file.
2021-09-03AssemblyNotice of intention to remove from inactive file given by Assembly Member Reyes.
2021-06-21AssemblyOrdered to inactive file on request of Assembly Member Reyes.
2021-06-21AssemblyFrom consent calendar on motion of Assembly Member Reyes.
2021-06-16AssemblyRead second time. Ordered to consent calendar.
2021-06-15AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass. Ordered to consent calendar. (Ayes 6. Noes 0.) (June 15).
2021-05-13AssemblyReferred to Com. on E.M.
2021-04-29AssemblyIn Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
2021-04-29SenateRead third time. Passed. (Ayes 36. Noes 0. Page 974.) Ordered to the Assembly.
2021-04-21SenateRead second time. Ordered to consent calendar.
2021-04-20SenateFrom committee: Do pass. Ordered to consent calendar. (Ayes 15. Noes 0. Page 857.) (April 20).
2021-04-07SenateSet for hearing April 20.
2021-04-06SenateFrom committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on G.O.
2021-03-11SenateReferred to Com. on G.O.
2021-03-04SenateFrom printer.
2021-03-03SenateArticle IV Section 8(a) of the Constitution and Joint Rule 55 dispensed with February 22, 2021, suspending the 30 calendar day requirement.
2021-03-03SenateIntroduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.

Code Citations

ChapterSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Government Code8561Amended CodeCitation Text

California State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback