CA SB815 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Engrossed on June 18 2020 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-08-31 - Ordered to third reading.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on June 18 2020 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-08-31 - Ordered to third reading.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Sections 8256, 12788, 12895, and 13979.2 of, to add Sections 8412 and 19815.7 to, to add the heading of Article 1 (commencing with Section 8400) to, and to add Article 2 (commencing with Section 8410) to, Chapter 5.6 of Division 1 of Title 2 of, and to add and repeal Article 3 (commencing with Section 12350) of Chapter 4 of Part 2 of Division 3 of Title 2 of, the Government Code, to amend Sections 17008.5, 17021, 17021.8, 17030.10, 50205, 50218.5, 50470, 50517.10, and 50715 of, and to add Section 17044 to, the Health and Safety Code, to amend Section 14556 of the Public Resources Code, to amend Section 99312.1 of the Public Utilities Code, to amend Section 1604 of, and to add Sections 1616, 1752.4, and 19551.2 to, the Revenue and Taxation Code, to add and repeal Section 337 of the Unemployment Insurance Code, to amend Section 8256 of the Welfare and Institutions Code, and to amend Section 27 of Chapter 15 of the Statutes of 2020, relating to state government, and making an appropriation therefor, to take effect immediately, bill related to the budget.
Title
State government.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-06-18 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB815 B. & F.R (Y: 29 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-08-31 | Assembly | Ordered to third reading. |
2020-08-31 | Assembly | Withdrawn from committee. |
2020-08-31 | Assembly | Assembly Rule 96 and 63 suspended. (Ayes 57. Noes 15. Page 5409.) |
2020-08-27 | Assembly | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on BUDGET. |
2020-08-24 | Assembly | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on BUDGET. |
2020-06-18 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on BUDGET. |
2020-06-18 | Assembly | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. |
2020-06-18 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 29. Noes 11. Page 3736.) Ordered to the Assembly. |
2020-03-10 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2020-03-09 | Senate | Ordered to second reading. |
2020-03-09 | Senate | Withdrawn from committee. (Ayes 28. Noes 10. Page 3366.) |
2020-01-22 | Senate | Referred to Com. on B. & F.R. |
2020-01-13 | Senate | Read first time. |
2020-01-13 | Senate | From printer. May be acted upon on or after February 12. |
2020-01-10 | Senate | Introduced. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |