CA SB814 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Engrossed on June 18 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-06-18 - Referred to Com. on BUDGET.
Pending: Assembly Budget Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

An act relating to the Budget Act of 2020.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Budget Act of 2020.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-06-18 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB814 B. & F.R (Y: 29 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-06-18AssemblyReferred to Com. on BUDGET.
2020-06-18AssemblyIn Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
2020-06-18SenateRead third time. Passed. (Ayes 29. Noes 11. Page 3736.) Ordered to the Assembly.
2020-03-10SenateRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2020-03-09SenateOrdered to second reading.
2020-03-09SenateWithdrawn from committee. (Ayes 28. Noes 10. Page 3366.)
2020-01-22SenateReferred to Com. on B. & F.R.
2020-01-13SenateRead first time.
2020-01-13SenateFrom printer. May be acted upon on or after February 12.
2020-01-10SenateIntroduced. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.

California State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback