CA SB814 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on August 29 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-08-29 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 230, Statutes of 2016.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

An act to add Chapter 3.3 (commencing with Section 365) to Division 1 of the Water Code, relating to water.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Drought: excessive water use: urban retail water suppliers.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2016-08-11 - Senate - Unfinished Business SB814 Hill Concurrence (Y: 23 N: 13 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-08-10 - Senate - From committee: That the Assembly Amendments be concurred in (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-08-04 - Assembly - SB 814 Hill Senate Third Reading By LEVINE (Y: 45 N: 29 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2016-06-29 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 12 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2016-06-14 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 9 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2016-05-09 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB814 Hill (Y: 23 N: 11 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-03-29 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Judiciary (Y: 7 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2016-08-29 Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 230, Statutes of 2016.
2016-08-29 Approved by the Governor.
2016-08-16SenateEnrolled and presented to the Governor at 11:30 a.m.
2016-08-11SenateAssembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 23. Noes 13. Page 4864.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
2016-08-10SenateFrom committee: That the Assembly amendments be concurred in. (Ayes 6. Noes 1. Page 4848.)
2016-08-09SenateSet for hearing August 10.
2016-08-08SenateRe-referred to Com. on N.R. & W. pursuant to Senate Rule 29.10(d). From committee: Be re-referred to Com. on N.R. & W. pursuant to Senate Rule 29.10(d). (Ayes 5. Noes 0. Page 4819.) Re-referred to Com. on N.R. & W.
2016-08-04SenateIn Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending.
2016-08-04AssemblyRead third time. Passed. (Ayes 45. Noes 29. Page 5710.) Ordered to the Senate.
2016-06-30AssemblyRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2016-06-29AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass. (Ayes 12. Noes 6.) (June 29).
2016-06-21AssemblyRead second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. (Corrected June 21).
2016-06-16AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 9. Noes 4.) (June 14).
2016-06-06AssemblyFrom committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on W., P., & W.
2016-05-16AssemblyReferred to Com. on W., P., & W.
2016-05-10AssemblyIn Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
2016-05-09SenateRead third time. Passed. (Ayes 23. Noes 11. Page 3801.) Ordered to the Assembly.
2016-05-03SenateRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2016-05-02SenateFrom committee: Be ordered to second reading pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8.
2016-04-22SenateSet for hearing May 2.
2016-03-31SenateWithdrawn from committee. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2016-03-30SenateFrom committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on JUD.
2016-03-29SenateFrom committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on JUD. (Ayes 7. Noes 2. Page 3312.) (March 29). Re-referred to Com. on JUD.
2016-03-17SenateFrom committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on N.R. & W.
2016-03-09SenateSet for hearing March 29.
2016-01-28SenateReferred to Coms. on N.R. & W. and JUD.
2016-01-05SenateFrom printer. May be acted upon on or after February 4.
2016-01-04SenateIntroduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.

Code Citations

ChapterSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Government Code6254.16Amended CodeCitation Text
Water Code365New CodeSee Bill Text

California State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/cgi-bin/postquery?bill_number=sb_814&sess=1516&house=S
Texthttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/15-16/bill/sen/sb_0801-0850/sb_814_bill_20160104_introduced.html
Texthttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/15-16/bill/sen/sb_0801-0850/sb_814_bill_20160317_amended_sen_v98.html
Texthttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/15-16/bill/sen/sb_0801-0850/sb_814_bill_20160330_amended_sen_v97.html
Texthttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/15-16/bill/sen/sb_0801-0850/sb_814_bill_20160606_amended_asm_v96.html
Texthttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/15-16/bill/sen/sb_0801-0850/sb_814_bill_20160621_amended_asm_v95.html
Texthttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/15-16/bill/sen/sb_0801-0850/sb_814_bill_20160812_enrolled.html
Texthttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/15-16/bill/sen/sb_0801-0850/sb_814_bill_20160829_chaptered.html
Roll Callhttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/15-16/bill/sen/sb_0801-0850/sb_814_vote_20160329_000001_sen_comm.html
Roll Callhttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/15-16/bill/sen/sb_0801-0850/sb_814_vote_20160509_0340PM_sen_floor.html
Roll Callhttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/15-16/bill/sen/sb_0801-0850/sb_814_vote_20160614_000001_asm_comm.html
Roll Callhttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/15-16/bill/sen/sb_0801-0850/sb_814_vote_20160629_000001_asm_comm.html
Roll Callhttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/15-16/bill/sen/sb_0801-0850/sb_814_vote_20160804_1022AM_asm_floor.html
Roll Callhttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/15-16/bill/sen/sb_0801-0850/sb_814_vote_20160810_000001_sen_comm.html
Roll Callhttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/15-16/bill/sen/sb_0801-0850/sb_814_vote_20160811_1033AM_sen_floor.html

Bill Comments 750

feedback