CA SB814 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-2)
Status: Passed on October 1 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-10-01 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 472, Statutes of 2013.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

An act to amend Sections 8405.2 and 12025 of the Fish and Game Code, to amend Sections 607, 2774, 2790, 30333, 30620, and 71205.3 of the Public Resources Code, and to amend Section 2810.2 of the Vehicle Code, relating to administration of public resources.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Natural resources: administration.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2013-09-04 - Senate - Unfinished Business SB814 Committee on N.R. & W. (Pavley) Concurrence (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-08-30 - Assembly - SB 814 N.R.& W. Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 78 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-08-21 - Assembly - Do pass, to Consent Calendar (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-08-12 - Assembly - Do pass and re-refer to Committee on Appropriations with recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-06-18 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Natural Resources to Consent Calendar (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2013-05-09 - Senate - Consent Calendar 2nd SB814 Committee on N.R. & W. (Pavley) (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-04-23 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations Recommend Consent (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2013-10-01 Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 472, Statutes of 2013.
2013-10-01 Approved by the Governor.
2013-09-10SenateEnrolled and presented to the Governor at 4 p.m.
2013-09-04SenateAssembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 35. Noes 0. Page 2132.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
2013-08-30SenateIn Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending.
2013-08-30AssemblyRead third time. Passed. (Ayes 78. Noes 0. Page 2796.) Ordered to the Senate.
2013-08-22AssemblyRead second time. Ordered to consent calendar.
2013-08-21AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass. Ordered to consent calendar. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (August 21).
2013-08-13AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To consent calendar. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (August 12). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2013-08-05AssemblyFrom committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on NAT. RES.
2013-06-26AssemblyFrom committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on NAT. RES.
2013-06-18AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on NAT. RES. with recommendation: To consent calendar. (Ayes 14. Noes 0.) (June 18). Re-referred to Com. on NAT. RES.
2013-06-10AssemblyFrom committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on W.,P. & W.
2013-05-24AssemblyReferred to Coms. on W.,P. & W. and NAT. RES.
2013-05-09AssemblyIn Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
2013-05-09SenateRead third time. Passed. (Ayes 34. Noes 0. Page 868.) Ordered to the Assembly.
2013-05-07SenateRead second time. Ordered to consent calendar.
2013-05-06SenateFrom committee: Be placed on second reading file pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8 and ordered to consent calendar.
2013-04-26SenateSet for hearing May 6.
2013-04-23SenateFrom committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To consent calendar. (Ayes 9. Noes 0. Page 643.) (April 23). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2013-04-11SenateFrom committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on N.R. & W.
2013-03-14SenateSet for hearing April 23.
2013-03-11SenateReferred to Com. on N.R. & W.
2013-02-27SenateFrom printer. May be acted upon on or after March 29.
2013-02-26SenateIntroduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.

Code Citations


California State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/cgi-bin/postquery?bill_number=sb_814&sess=1314&house=S
Texthttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/13-14/bill/sen/sb_0801-0850/sb_814_bill_20130226_introduced.html
Texthttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/13-14/bill/sen/sb_0801-0850/sb_814_bill_20130411_amended_sen_v98.html
Texthttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/13-14/bill/sen/sb_0801-0850/sb_814_bill_20130610_amended_asm_v97.html
Texthttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/13-14/bill/sen/sb_0801-0850/sb_814_bill_20130626_amended_asm_v96.html
Texthttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/13-14/bill/sen/sb_0801-0850/sb_814_bill_20130805_amended_asm_v95.html
Texthttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/13-14/bill/sen/sb_0801-0850/sb_814_bill_20130906_enrolled.html
Texthttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/13-14/bill/sen/sb_0801-0850/sb_814_bill_20131001_chaptered.html
Roll Callhttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/13-14/bill/sen/sb_0801-0850/sb_814_vote_20130423_000002_sen_comm.html
Roll Callhttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/13-14/bill/sen/sb_0801-0850/sb_814_vote_20130509_1006AM_sen_floor.html
Roll Callhttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/13-14/bill/sen/sb_0801-0850/sb_814_vote_20130618_000002_asm_comm.html
Roll Callhttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/13-14/bill/sen/sb_0801-0850/sb_814_vote_20130812_000001_asm_comm.html
Roll Callhttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/13-14/bill/sen/sb_0801-0850/sb_814_vote_20130821_000001_asm_comm.html
Roll Callhttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/13-14/bill/sen/sb_0801-0850/sb_814_vote_20130830_1056AM_asm_floor.html
Roll Callhttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/13-14/bill/sen/sb_0801-0850/sb_814_vote_20130904_0218PM_sen_floor.html

Bill Comments 750

feedback