CA SB81 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on October 8 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-10-08 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 721, Statutes of 2021.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

An act to amend Section 1385 of the Penal Code, relating to sentencing.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Sentencing: dismissal of enhancements.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-09-09 - Senate - Unfinished Business SB81 Skinner et al. Concurrence (Y: 23 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2021-09-08 - Assembly - SB 81 Skinner Senate Third Reading By Bauer-Kahan (Y: 46 N: 24 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2021-08-26 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 11 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-06-29 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 6 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-26 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB81 Skinner (Y: 27 N: 9 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-20 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-03 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-16 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-10-08 Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 721, Statutes of 2021.
2021-10-08 Approved by the Governor.
2021-09-17 Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 1:30 p.m.
2021-09-09SenateAssembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 23. Noes 11. Page 2553.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
2021-09-08SenateIn Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending.
2021-09-08AssemblyRead third time. Passed. (Ayes 46. Noes 24. Page 2941.) Ordered to the Senate.
2021-08-31AssemblyRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2021-08-30AssemblyRead second time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
2021-08-26AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 11. Noes 4.) (August 26).
2021-07-14AssemblyJuly 14 set for first hearing. Placed on suspense file.
2021-07-01AssemblyRead second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2021-06-30AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 6. Noes 2.) (June 29).
2021-06-15AssemblyJune 15 set for first hearing canceled at the request of author.
2021-06-03AssemblyReferred to Com. on PUB. S.
2021-05-26AssemblyIn Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
2021-05-26SenateRead third time. Passed. (Ayes 27. Noes 9. Page 1259.) Ordered to the Assembly.
2021-05-20SenateRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2021-05-20SenateFrom committee: Do pass. (Ayes 5. Noes 2. Page 1182.) (May 20).
2021-05-14SenateSet for hearing May 20.
2021-05-04SenateMay 3 hearing: Placed on APPR suspense file.
2021-04-27SenateFrom committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2021-04-21SenateSet for hearing May 3.
2021-04-15SenateApril 19 set for first hearing canceled at the request of author.
2021-04-08SenateFrom committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2021-04-06SenateSet for hearing April 19.
2021-04-05SenateApril 5 hearing postponed by committee.
2021-03-23SenateFrom committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2021-03-19SenateSet for hearing April 5.
2021-03-17SenateFrom committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 4. Noes 0. Page 520.) (March 16). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2021-02-24SenateSet for hearing March 16.
2021-02-17SenateRe-referred to Com. on PUB. S.
2021-02-08SenateFrom committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on RLS.
2021-01-28SenateReferred to Com. on RLS.
2021-01-11SenateRead first time.
2020-12-16SenateFrom printer. May be acted upon on or after January 15.
2020-12-15SenateIntroduced. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.

Code Citations

ChapterSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Penal Code1385Amended CodeCitation Text

California State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://leginfo.legislature.ca.gov/faces/billStatusClient.xhtml?bill_id=202120220SB81
Texthttps://leginfo.legislature.ca.gov/faces/billTextClient.xhtml?bill_id=202120220SB81#99INT
Texthttps://leginfo.legislature.ca.gov/faces/billTextClient.xhtml?bill_id=202120220SB81#98AMD
Texthttps://leginfo.legislature.ca.gov/faces/billTextClient.xhtml?bill_id=202120220SB81#97AMD
Texthttps://leginfo.legislature.ca.gov/faces/billTextClient.xhtml?bill_id=202120220SB81#96AMD
Texthttps://leginfo.legislature.ca.gov/faces/billTextClient.xhtml?bill_id=202120220SB81#95AMD
Texthttps://leginfo.legislature.ca.gov/faces/billTextClient.xhtml?bill_id=202120220SB81#94AMD
Texthttps://leginfo.legislature.ca.gov/faces/billTextClient.xhtml?bill_id=202120220SB81#93AMD
Texthttps://leginfo.legislature.ca.gov/faces/billTextClient.xhtml?bill_id=202120220SB81#92ENR
Texthttps://leginfo.legislature.ca.gov/faces/billTextClient.xhtml?bill_id=202120220SB81#91CHP
Roll Callhttp://leginfo.legislature.ca.gov/faces/billVotesClient.xhtml?bill_id=202120220SB81

Bill Comments

feedback