CA SB81 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (? 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 27 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-27 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 28, Statutes of 2019.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

An act to amend Sections 1180.4, 1567.62, 1567.70, and 1567.81 of the Health and Safety Code, and to amend Sections 4434, 4571, 4572, 4622, 4622.5, 4629, 4629.5, 4640.6, 4642, 4646, 4648, 4659.1, 4684.82, 4684.87, 4692, 4698, 6500, 6509, and 7505 of, and to add Sections 4474.16, 4474.17, 4519.2, 4519.4, 4625.6, 4625.7, 4639.6, 4640.9, 4691.12, and 4696.3 to, the Welfare and Institutions Code, relating to developmental services, and making an appropriation therefor, to take effect immediately, bill related to the budget.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Developmental services.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-06-20 - Assembly - SB 81 B. & F. R. Senate Third Reading By TING (Y: 79 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-20 - Senate - Unfinished Business SB81 B. & F.R. (Mitchell) Concurrence (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-11 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB81 B. & F.R (Y: 27 N: 9 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-06-27 Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 28, Statutes of 2019.
2019-06-27 Approved by the Governor.
2019-06-27SenateEnrolled and presented to the Governor at 4 p.m.
2019-06-20SenateAssembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 40. Noes 0. Page 1676.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
2019-06-20SenateIn Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending.
2019-06-20AssemblyRead third time. Passed. (Ayes 79. Noes 0. Page 2369.) Ordered to the Senate.
2019-06-20AssemblyAssembly Rule 63 and 96 suspended. (Ayes 56. Noes 13. Page 2361.)
2019-06-20AssemblyOrdered to third reading.
2019-06-20AssemblyWithdrawn from committee.
2019-06-17AssemblyFrom committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on BUDGET.
2019-06-12AssemblyFrom committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on BUDGET.
2019-05-02AssemblyReferred to Com. on BUDGET.
2019-04-11AssemblyIn Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
2019-04-11SenateRead third time. Passed. (Ayes 27. Noes 9. Page 665.) Ordered to the Assembly.
2019-04-09SenateRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2019-04-08SenateOrdered to second reading.
2019-04-08SenateWithdrawn from committee. (Ayes 28. Noes 10. Page 582.)
2019-01-24SenateReferred to Com. on B. & F.R.
2019-01-11SenateFrom printer. May be acted upon on or after February 10.
2019-01-10SenateIntroduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.

Code Citations

ChapterSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Health and Safety Code1180.4Amended CodeCitation Text
Health and Safety Code1567.62Amended CodeCitation Text
Health and Safety Code1567.70Amended CodeCitation Text
Health and Safety Code1567.81Amended CodeCitation Text
Welfare and Institutions Code4434Amended CodeCitation Text
Welfare and Institutions Code4474.16New CodeSee Bill Text
Welfare and Institutions Code4474.17New CodeSee Bill Text
Welfare and Institutions Code4519.2New CodeSee Bill Text
Welfare and Institutions Code4519.4New CodeSee Bill Text
Welfare and Institutions Code4571Amended CodeCitation Text
Welfare and Institutions Code4572Amended CodeCitation Text
Welfare and Institutions Code4622Amended CodeCitation Text
Welfare and Institutions Code4622.5Amended CodeCitation Text
Welfare and Institutions Code4625.6New CodeSee Bill Text
Welfare and Institutions Code4625.7New CodeSee Bill Text
Welfare and Institutions Code4629Amended CodeCitation Text
Welfare and Institutions Code4629.5Amended CodeCitation Text
Welfare and Institutions Code4639.6New CodeSee Bill Text
Welfare and Institutions Code4640.6Amended CodeCitation Text
Welfare and Institutions Code4640.9New CodeSee Bill Text
Welfare and Institutions Code4642Amended CodeCitation Text
Welfare and Institutions Code4646Amended CodeCitation Text
Welfare and Institutions Code4648Amended CodeCitation Text
Welfare and Institutions Code4659.1Amended CodeCitation Text
Welfare and Institutions Code4684.82Amended CodeCitation Text
Welfare and Institutions Code4684.87Amended CodeCitation Text
Welfare and Institutions Code4691.12New CodeSee Bill Text
Welfare and Institutions Code4692Amended CodeCitation Text
Welfare and Institutions Code4696.3New CodeSee Bill Text
Welfare and Institutions Code4698Amended CodeCitation Text
Welfare and Institutions Code6500Amended CodeCitation Text
Welfare and Institutions Code6509Amended CodeCitation Text
Welfare and Institutions Code7505Amended CodeCitation Text

California State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback